This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:18:45

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Maurice McLemore in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-BK-19028
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Scott C Clarkson
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Trustee Lynda T. Bui (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Maurice McLemore
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • US Trustee United States Trustee (RS)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
7 #3

Main Document - Correct PDF

Fees Apply
7 #2

Main Document - InCorrect PDF

Fees Apply
7 #1

Main Document - Incorrect PDF

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debto...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Mauric...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on ...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • (#7) Order that Debtor(s) shall appear at hearing on Application for Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee. Hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 304. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/15/2019 (RE: related document(s)#6 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Debtor Maurice McLemore). (Tapia, Eileen) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019 (Tapia, Eileen). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019 (Tapia, Eileen). Modified on 10/15/2019 (Tapia, Eileen). (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Maurice McLemore (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Maurice McLemore . (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Maurice McLemore . (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Maurice McLemore . (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Maurice McLemore (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.