This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 13:26:17 (UTC).

Matra Petroleum USA, Inc. and Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Matra Petroleum USA, Inc and Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-BK-34190

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtors

Matra Petroleum USA, Inc.

708 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC

708 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC

708 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Matra Terra, LLC

708 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Yet Classified

Buckley & Boots, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Vianey Garza

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek

5051 Westheimer, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Deirdre Carey Brown

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek LLP

5051 Westheimer, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Melissa Anne Haselden

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek LLP

5051 Westheimer, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Angeline Vachris Kell

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek LLP

5051 Westheimer, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Us Trustee Attorney

Hector Duran, Jr

Attorney at U.S. Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

255 #3

Proposed Order

255 #2

Exhibit A

255 #1

Main Document

#254

(#254) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#250 Order on Generic Application) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/24/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#253

(#253) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#249 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/23/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#252

(#252) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Lauritzen Filed by on behalf of Brandy Bright Land & Cattle, LLC (Lauritzen, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#250

(#250) Order on First and Final Application of Buckley & Boots, LLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered as Valuation Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from August 1, 2019 to November 30, 2019 (Related Doc #225) Signed on 4/22/2020. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

248 #2

Proposed Order

#249

(#249) Order Authorizing Sale of Vehicles Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances (Related Doc #212) Signed on 4/20/2020. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#112

(#112) Transcript RE: Motion Hearing held on August 27, 2019 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 12/11/2019. (mhen) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#111

(#111) Certificate of No Objection To Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry of Final Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Obligations Owed To Holders of Mineral and Other Interests, (II) Limiting Notice, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Filed By Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC ).(Related document(s):#66 Emergency Motion) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

110 #2

Proposed Order

110 #1

Main Document

66 #2

Proposed Order

66 #1

Main Document

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Matra Petroleum USA, Inc.. (Haselden, Melissa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

400 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Enter into Insurance Premium Financing Agreement and to Provide Adequate Protection Filed by Debtors Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#250 Order on Generic Application) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/24/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#249 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/23/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Lauritzen Filed by on behalf of Brandy Bright Land & Cattle, LLC (Lauritzen, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) Declaration re: Declaration of BMC Group Mailing Docket No. 248 (Filed By Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC ).(Related document(s):#248 Generic Motion) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) Order on First and Final Application of Buckley & Boots, LLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered as Valuation Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from August 1, 2019 to November 30, 2019 (Related Doc #225) Signed on 4/22/2020. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) Motion Debtors' Motion to (I) Conditionally Approve Disclosure Statement; (II) Authorize Debtor to Solicit Votes and Establishing Voting Deadline; and (III) Schedule a Combined Hearing on the Final Approval of the Disclosure Statement and Confirmation of Plan and Establish Deadlines Related Thereto Filed by Debtors Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) Order Authorizing Sale of Vehicles Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances (Related Doc #212) Signed on 4/20/2020. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#247) Disclosure Statement Filed by Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC. (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#246) Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC. (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
249 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Obligations Owed to Holders of Mineral and Other Interests, (II) Limiting Notice, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc #66) Signed on 9/12/2019. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Corporate Bank Accounts; and (II) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms and Records, Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Matra Petroleum USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC ). (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By Matra Petroleum USA, Inc. ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haselden, Melissa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Emergency Motion , Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Matra Petroleum USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haselden, Melissa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Transcript RE: Motion Hearing held on August 27, 2019 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 12/11/2019. (mhen) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Certificate of No Objection To Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry of Final Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Obligations Owed To Holders of Mineral and Other Interests, (II) Limiting Notice, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Filed By Matra Petroleum Oil & Gas, LLC, Matra Petroleum Operating, LLC, Matra Petroleum USA, Inc., Matra Terra, LLC ).(Related document(s):#66 Emergency Motion) (Garza, Vianey) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(19-34190) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21347046. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Matra Petroleum USA, Inc.. (Haselden, Melissa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) Motion for Entry of Agreed Order (Automatic Stay) Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Turbyfill, Donald) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant