This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2021 at 06:33:15 (UTC).

MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David S Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11258

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David S Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC

600 Fifth Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building

201 Varick Street, ROOM 1006

Not Classified By Court

Kurtzman Carson Consultants

222 N. Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Elisha D. Graff

Attorney at SimpsonThacher & Bartlett, LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities - Non-Individual Filed by Elisha D. Graff on behalf of MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC. (Graff, Elisha) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment (related document(s) (Related Doc #3)) . Notice Date 07/09/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Order Signed on 7/8/2021 (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All Further Pleadings and Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, and All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case No. 21-11255. (Related Doc #2) (Calderon, Lynda) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

3 #2

Case Reassignment Notice: Notice Recipients

3 #1

Case Reassignment Notice

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/4/2021, Disclosure Statement due by 11/4/2021, Initial Case Conference due by 8/6/2021, Filed by Elisha D. Graff of SimpsonThacher & Bartlett, LLP on behalf of MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC. (Graff, Elisha) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities - Non-Individual Filed by Elisha D. Graff on behalf of MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC. (Graff, Elisha) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment (related document(s) (Related Doc #3)) . Notice Date 07/09/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Joint Administration. All further docket entries are to be filed in the Lead Case No. 21-11255. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Signed on 7/8/2021 (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All Further Pleadings and Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, and All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case No. 21-11255. (Related Doc #2) (Calderon, Lynda) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. to Judge David S Jones. Judge David S Jones added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketJudge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases, with Exhibit A (Proposed Order) filed by Elisha D. Graff on behalf of MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Graff, Elisha) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11258) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15416789. Fee amount 1738.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/4/2021, Disclosure Statement due by 11/4/2021, Initial Case Conference due by 8/6/2021, Filed by Elisha D. Graff of SimpsonThacher & Bartlett, LLP on behalf of MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC. (Graff, Elisha) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant