This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 at 05:05:52 (UTC).

Martin Miguel Centurion and Magalita R Centurion

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Martin Miguel Centurion and Magalita R Centurion in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-BK-12352

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Debtors

Martin Miguel Centurion

Magalita R Centurion

US Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

Trustee

Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR)

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/19/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proof of Claim due by 11/27/2019. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Magalita R Centurion, Debtor Martin Miguel Centurion. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Magalita R Centurion, Debtor Martin Miguel Centurion. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/19/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proof of Claim due by 11/27/2019. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(1:19-bk-12352) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49766765. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Magalita R Centurion, Debtor Martin Miguel Centurion. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Magalita R Centurion, Debtor Martin Miguel Centurion. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Magalita R Centurion, Debtor Martin Miguel Centurion. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Martin Miguel Centurion, Magalita R Centurion Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/2/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/2/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/2/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/2/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/2/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/2/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/2/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/2/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/2/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/2/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/2/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/2/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/2/2019. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 10/2/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/2/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/2/2019. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.