This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:06:43 (UTC).

Marine Kasabyan

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Marine Kasabyan in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-BK-12590

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Victoria S. Kaufman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Marine Kasabyan

US Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

Trustee

David Keith Gottlieb (TR)

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Marine Kasabyan . (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 05. Receipt Number 10074703. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Marine Kasabyan . (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Marine Kasabyan . (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Marine Kasabyan Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/14/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.