Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:12:29 (UTC).

Marine Akrabian

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Marine Akrabian was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-22148

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Marine Akrabian

Lancaster, CA 93534

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Marine Akrabian . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

Ch 13 First Mtg

2 #1

Incorrect Entry

1 #5

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #4

Case Com Def Notice

1 #3

Incorrect Entry

1 #2

Incorrect Entry

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20237732. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Marine Akrabian . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Marine Akrabian . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Judge Julia W. Brand added to case related case#: 2:18-bk-20780-WB and 2:12-bk-18252-WB (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Marine Akrabian Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant