This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:17:55

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Marcella Calvillo in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-BK-19021
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 13
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Scott H. Yun
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Trustee Rod Danielson (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Marcella Calvillo
  • Represented By
    • Laleh Ensafi
  • US Trustee United States Trustee (RS)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Individual (Offic...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20...

Fees Apply
1 #4

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

Fees Apply
1 #3

Correct ccdn

Fees Apply
1 #2

Incorrect ccdn

Fees Apply
#1

Main Document

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • (#9) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C) , Schedule D Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E (Official Form B6E) - Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims , Schedule E/F Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Schedule I Individual: Your Income (Official Form 106I) , Schedule J: Your Expenses (Official Form 106J) Filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Ensafi, Laleh) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#8) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judge/Trustee was reassigned due to prior case 6:19-bk-15237-SY. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/7/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Judge Scott H. Yun added to case due to prior related case 6:19-bk-15237-SY. Involvement of Judge Wayne E. Johnson Terminated (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#6) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect debtor(s) address entered. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo. (Ensafi, Laleh) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Ensafi, Laleh) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Ensafi, Laleh) WARNING: Notice not generated thru BNC due to Judge reassignment. See docket entry no. 7 for correct notice. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Jefferson, Angie). (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Marcella Calvillo (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Ensafi, Laleh) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:19-bk-19021) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49918133. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Marcella Calvillo Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 10/29/2019. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 10/29/2019. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2019. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 10/29/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Ensafi, Laleh) WARNING: Case Not Deficient for BPP Ntc. Dcl. Sign. (Form 119), Discl Comp of BPP (Form 2800), Means Calculation(Form 122C-2), Schedule J-2 (Form 106J-2). See docket entry no. 5, 6, and 8 for corrective actions. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Jefferson, Angie). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.