This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 06:40:12 (UTC).

Mall del Norte, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Mall del Norte, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Marvin Isgur and David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-35258

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judges

Marvin Isgur

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

Mall del Norte, LLC

2030 Hamilton Place Blvd., Cbl Center, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37421

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Alfredo R Perez

Attorney at Weil Gotshal et al

700 Louisiana, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 20-35226. Signed on 11/3/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Mall del Norte, LLC. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-35258) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22569541. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketJudge David R Jones is added to the case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur is terminated. (aaloadi) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-35226 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 20-35226. Signed on 11/3/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Mall del Norte, LLC. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo R Perez