This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/24/2022 at 06:30:23 (UTC).

M2 Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 M2 Systems Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Grace E. Robson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-00666

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Grace E. Robson

 

Party Details

Debtor

M2 Systems Corporation

600 Northlake Blvd., Suite 230

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

Trustee

Robert Altman

Palatka, FL 32178-0922

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Daniel A Velasquez

Attorney at Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP

201 S. Orange Ave., Ste. 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorneys

Miriam G Suarez

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

Bryan E Buenaventura

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office - Region 21

400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 23, 2022 through March 31, 2022 Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#51

(#51) Request for Notice Filed by Jennifer Laufgas on behalf of Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Laufgas, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#50

(#50) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #44)). Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

#49

(#49) Amended Certificate of Service Re: Order Scheduling (I) Hearing on Confirmation of Plan of Reorganization, (II) Deadlines with Respect to Confirmation Hearing, and (III) Deadlines for Filing Administrative Expense Applications and the Plan of Reorganization Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (related document(s)#45, #42, #44). (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#48

(#48) Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

45 #2

Mailing Matrix

45 #1

Main Document

#44

(#44) Order Scheduling Confirmation (related document(s)#43). Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2022 at 03:15 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#42

(#45) Certificate of Service Re: Order Scheduling (I) Hearing on Confirmation of Plan of Reorganization, (II) Deadlines with Respect to Confirmation Hearing, and (III) Deadlines for Filing Administrative Expense Applications. and Plan of Reorganization Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (related document(s)#42, #44). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

8 #2

List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors

7 #2

List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors

7 #1

Main Document

6 #2

List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance Filed by Miriam G Suarez on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Suarez, Miriam) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/7/2022 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Daniel Velasquez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.)Disclosure of Compensation. List of 20 Largest Creditors.. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of M2 Systems Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 05/24/2022. (Velasquez, Daniel) Modified on 2/24/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 02/23/2022)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 23, 2022 through March 31, 2022 Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Request for Notice Filed by Jennifer Laufgas on behalf of Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Laufgas, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #44)). Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Amended Certificate of Service Re: Order Scheduling (I) Hearing on Confirmation of Plan of Reorganization, (II) Deadlines with Respect to Confirmation Hearing, and (III) Deadlines for Filing Administrative Expense Applications and the Plan of Reorganization Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (related document(s)#45, #42, #44). (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Proof of Service of Final Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (related document(s)#46). (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Final Order Granting Motion For Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Related Doc #7). Service Instructions: Daniel Velasquez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Rutha) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Certificate of Service Re: Order Scheduling (I) Hearing on Confirmation of Plan of Reorganization, (II) Deadlines with Respect to Confirmation Hearing, and (III) Deadlines for Filing Administrative Expense Applications. and Plan of Reorganization Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (related document(s)#42, #44). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Order Scheduling Confirmation (related document(s)#43). Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2022 at 03:15 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Daniel Velasquez (Debtor Atty); Joseph Adams (Debtor CEO); Audrey Aleskovsky (US Trustee Atty); Robert Altman (Sub V Trustee); RULING: (ZOOM) Initial Status Conference - cont. to CONFIRMATION on May 18, 2022 at 3:15 pm (**CM ENTER ORDER SCHEDULING CONFIRMATION FOR MAY 18, 2022 AT 3:15 PM**) 1) Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #7) - Granted (final basis):Order by Velasquez; (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors) (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries and Request for Emergency Preliminary Hearing Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors) (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors) (Velasquez, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance Filed by Miriam G Suarez on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Suarez, Miriam) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/7/2022 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Daniel Velasquez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#3) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Pdf Not Attached). Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/7/2022 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) Modified on 02/24/2022 (Lisa P.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Grace E. Robson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor M2 Systems Corporation. (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 6:22-bk-00666) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A69433038, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.)Disclosure of Compensation. List of 20 Largest Creditors.. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of M2 Systems Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 05/24/2022. (Velasquez, Daniel) Modified on 2/24/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E Buenaventura

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miriam G Suarez