This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 05:20:56 (UTC).

Lynette Diane Hernandez

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Lynette Diane Hernandez in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-BK-11897

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Lynette Diane Hernandez

Moorpark, CA 93021

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (ND)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Elizabeth (ND) F Rojas (TR)

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Reed H Olmstead

Attorney at Law Offices of Reed H. Olmstead

5266 Hollister Ave, Ste 224

Santa Barbara, CA 93111

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2020. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lynette Diane Hernandez. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2020. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(9:19-bk-11897) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50105941. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Lynette Diane Hernandez. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lynette Diane Hernandez. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Lynette Diane Hernandez Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 11/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 11/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 11/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 11/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 11/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 11/29/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 11/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/29/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 11/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 11/29/2019. (Olmstead, Reed) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less