This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/29/2022 at 14:12:42 (UTC).

LTL Management LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 LTL Management LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, North Carolina Western Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Craig Whitley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-BK-30589

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J. Craig Whitley

 

Party Details

Debtor

LTL Management LLC

501 George Street

New Brunswick, NJ 08933

Us Trustee

U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office

402 W. Trade Street, Suite 200

Charlotte, NC 28202-1669

Interested Parties

Johnson & Johnson

One Johnson & Johnson Plaza

New Brunswick, NJ 08933-7001

State of Texas

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd, LLC

The Plaintiffs Steering Committee in the In re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Multi-District Litigation

Cyprus Mines Corporation

RheinLand Versicherungen, (as successor in interest only to the subscriptions of the former Dutch company Rheinland Verzekeringen)

N.V. Schadeverzekeringsmaatschappij Maas Lloyd, (individually and as successor in interest to policies subscribed in favor of Johnson & Johnson by N.V. Rotterdamse Assurantiekas n/k/a De Ark)

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, (as successor in interest to Republic Insurance Company)

The North River Insurance Company

New Hampshire Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA

Lexington Insurance Company

The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Granite State Insurance Company

ASR Schadeverzekering N.V., (as successor in interest to Assurantiekoor Van Wijk & Co.)

AIU Insurance Company

AIG Europe S.A., (as successor in interest to Union Atlantique d'Assurances S.A.)

AIG Property Casualty Company, (f/k/a Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania)

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Interested Party Attorneys

Caitlin K. Cahow

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Brad B. Erens

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Kristen R. Fournier

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Kathleen A Frazier

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Gregory M. Gordon

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert W. Hamilton

Attorney at Jones Day

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43215

James M. Jones

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Glenn M. Kurtz

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The America

New York, NY 10020

Jessica Lauria

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The America

New York,, NY 10020

Daniel B. Prieto

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark W. Rasmussen

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Stret

Dallas, TX 75201

Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

1200 Carillon, 227 W. Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Amanda Rush

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

John R. Miller, Jr.

Attorney at RAYBURN COOPER & DURHAM, P.A.

1200 The Carillon, 227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

C. Richard Rayburn, Jr.

Attorney at Rayburn Cooper Durham P.A.

227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Matthew L Tomsic

Attorney at Rayburn Cooper Durham P.A.

227 West Trade St., Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Laura L. Femino

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131-2352

Ricardo Pasianotto

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The America,

New York, NY 10020

Michael C. Shepherd

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131-2352

Hillary B. Crabtree

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen PLLC

100 N. Tryon Street, Suite 4700

Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

89 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#453

(#453) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#305 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#452

(#452) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#306 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#451

(#451) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#304 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#450

No Description Available

#449

No Description Available

#420

No Description Available

416 #2

Notice of Transfer of Case

416 #1

Main Document

#414

No Description Available

#413

No Description Available

#412

No Description Available

#411

No Description Available

#410

No Description Available

#407

No Description Available

#406

No Description Available

#405

No Description Available

#404

No Description Available

456 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketBankruptcy Case Closed. (cet) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Disinterest and Request to No Longer Receive Notices in Case filed by C. Richard Rayburn Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Rayburn, C.) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAdversary Proceeding Closed. (gav) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Disinterest and Request to No Longer Receive Notices in Case filed by Deborah L. Fletcher on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company (f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company). (Fletcher, Deborah) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Disinterest and Request to No Longer Receive Notices in Case filed by James C White on behalf of OnderLaw, LLC. (White, James) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Disinterest and Request to No Longer Receive Notices in Case filed by Meghan Van Vynckt on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Van Vynckt, Meghan) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Disinterest and Request to No Longer Receive Notices in Case filed by Stacy C. Cordes on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Cordes, Stacy) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#453) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#305 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#452) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#306 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#451) Notice of Withdrawal of Document (RE: related document(s)#304 Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Interested Party Imerys Talc America, Inc.) filed by Ashley S. Rusher on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rusher, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
510 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Certain Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures. filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion Debtor's Motion for an Order (A) Authorizing the Filing Under Seal of Certain Confidential Commercial Information in Connection with the Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Establishment of a Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Talc Claims and (B) if Necessary, In Camera Hearing. filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Establishment of a Qualified Settlement Fund for Payment of Talc Claims. filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Debtor's Motion for an Order: (I) Authorizing It to File a List of the Top Law Firms with Talc Cases Against the Debtor in Lieu of the List of the 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors; (II) Approving Certain Notice Procedures for Talc Claimants; and (III) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of Commencement of this Case. filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application w/Affidavit to Employ Professional Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims, Noticing and Ballot Agent filed by Matthew L Tomsic on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Tomsic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration of John K. Kim in Support of First Day Pleadings filed by C. Richard Rayburn Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Rayburn, C.) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) List of Creditors. filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Brief Informational Brief of LTL Management LLC filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Ex Parte Motion Debtor's Ex Parte Motion for an Order Suspending Entry and Service of Standard Notice fo Commencement. filed by Matthew L Tomsic on behalf of LTL Management LLC. (Tomsic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 - (Miller, John) Modified on 10/15/2021 (mdw). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Filing Fee Amount $1,738.00. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bankruptcy Court is a litigant

Latest cases where AIU INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant