Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 08:03:11 (UTC).

LPQ Garden City, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 LPQ Garden City, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-11290

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

John T. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Debtor

LPQ Garden City, Inc.

50 Broad Street, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Not Classified By Court

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.

6201 15Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Brendan Joseph Schlauch

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mark D. Collins

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of PQ New York, Inc. (Case No. 20-11266 (JTD)) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms hereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11266 (JTD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/28/2020. (RC) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 33rd Street Bakery, Inc., Florence Bakery, Inc., LPQ 14th & K Street, Inc., LPQ 205 Bleecker, Inc., LPQ 85 Broad, Inc., LPQ Aventura, Inc., LPQ Cabin John, Inc., LPQ Claremont, Inc., LPQ Coconut Grove, Inc., LPQ Garden City, Inc., LPQ King & Hudson, Inc., LPQ N. Wells St, Inc., LPQ Naperville, Inc., LPQ North Michigan, Inc., LPQ Pasadena, Inc., LPQ Reston, Inc., LPQ Sailboat Pond, Inc., LPQ South End Ave, Inc., LPQ South Gayley, Inc., LPQ South Lasalle, Inc., LPQ Toluca Lake, Inc., LPQ West 55th & 8th St, Inc., LPQ Woodbury, Inc., PQ 17th Street, Inc., PQ 44th & Madison, Inc., PQ 44th Street, Inc., PQ 53rd Street, Inc., PQ 550 Hudson, Inc., PQ 55th & 1st, Inc., PQ 6th & Olive, Inc., PQ 6th Ave., Inc., PQ 8th & Walnut, Inc., PQ 8th Street, Inc., PQ 933 Broadway, Inc., PQ 97th Street, Inc., PQ Alexandria, Inc., PQ Americana, Inc., PQ Bakery, LLC, PQ Battery Park, Inc., PQ Bethesda, Inc., PQ Beverly Hills, Inc., PQ Blaine Mansion, Inc., PQ Bleecker, Inc., PQ Brentwood, Inc., PQ Bryant Park, Inc., PQ Calabasas, Inc., PQ Capitol Hill, Inc., PQ Carnegie Hill, Inc., PQ Carroll Square, Inc., PQ Central Park, Inc., PQ Chelsea, Inc., PQ Chevy Chase, Inc., PQ Clarendon, Inc., PQ Culver Plaza, Inc., PQ East 65th St, Inc., PQ East 77th, Inc., PQ East 83rd St, Inc., PQ Encino Bakery, Inc., PQ First Inc., PQ French Market, Inc., PQ Georgetown Inc., PQ Gold Coast, Inc., PQ Granary, Inc., PQ Greenwich, Inc., PQ Harbor Point, Inc., PQ Larchmont, Inc., PQ Lexington, Inc., PQ Lincoln Park, Inc., PQ Lincoln Square, Inc., PQ Manhattan Beach, Inc., PQ Meatpacking District, Inc., PQ Melrose, Inc., PQ Merrifield, Inc., PQ Mineral Springs, Inc., PQ Montague, Inc., PQ Mt. Vernon, Inc., PQ New Canaan, Inc., PQ New York, Inc., PQ Newport Beach Bakery, Inc., PQ Operations, Inc., PQ Park & 33rd, Inc., PQ Park Slope, Inc., PQ Robertson, Inc., PQ Rye, Inc., PQ San Vicente, Inc., PQ Santa Monica, Inc., PQ Soho, LLC, PQ Spring Valley, Inc., PQ Studio City, Inc., PQ The Village at Topanga, Inc., PQ Tribeca, Inc., PQ Tysons Corner, Inc., PQ UN, Inc., PQ Union Square, Inc., PQ Union Station, Inc., PQ Upper West, Inc., PQ Villa Marina, Inc., PQ Walnut Street, Inc., PQ Wayne, Inc., PQ West 72nd, Inc., PQ West 84th, Inc., PQ Westlake, Inc., PQ Wildwood, Inc., Tuxedo Bakery, Inc., Walnut St. Bakery, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition .Receipt # 92719 Fee Amount $1717. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Collins, Mark) Modified on 5/29/2020 (COH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of PQ New York, Inc. (Case No. 20-11266 (JTD)) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms hereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11266 (JTD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/28/2020. (RC) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) See Docket # 1 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-11290) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 11, amount $1717.00. (COH) Modified on 5/29/2020 (COH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge John T. Dorsey added to case (LB) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 33rd Street Bakery, Inc., Florence Bakery, Inc., LPQ 14th & K Street, Inc., LPQ 205 Bleecker, Inc., LPQ 85 Broad, Inc., LPQ Aventura, Inc., LPQ Cabin John, Inc., LPQ Claremont, Inc., LPQ Coconut Grove, Inc., LPQ Garden City, Inc., LPQ King & Hudson, Inc., LPQ N. Wells St, Inc., LPQ Naperville, Inc., LPQ North Michigan, Inc., LPQ Pasadena, Inc., LPQ Reston, Inc., LPQ Sailboat Pond, Inc., LPQ South End Ave, Inc., LPQ South Gayley, Inc., LPQ South Lasalle, Inc., LPQ Toluca Lake, Inc., LPQ West 55th & 8th St, Inc., LPQ Woodbury, Inc., PQ 17th Street, Inc., PQ 44th & Madison, Inc., PQ 44th Street, Inc., PQ 53rd Street, Inc., PQ 550 Hudson, Inc., PQ 55th & 1st, Inc., PQ 6th & Olive, Inc., PQ 6th Ave., Inc., PQ 8th & Walnut, Inc., PQ 8th Street, Inc., PQ 933 Broadway, Inc., PQ 97th Street, Inc., PQ Alexandria, Inc., PQ Americana, Inc., PQ Bakery, LLC, PQ Battery Park, Inc., PQ Bethesda, Inc., PQ Beverly Hills, Inc., PQ Blaine Mansion, Inc., PQ Bleecker, Inc., PQ Brentwood, Inc., PQ Bryant Park, Inc., PQ Calabasas, Inc., PQ Capitol Hill, Inc., PQ Carnegie Hill, Inc., PQ Carroll Square, Inc., PQ Central Park, Inc., PQ Chelsea, Inc., PQ Chevy Chase, Inc., PQ Clarendon, Inc., PQ Culver Plaza, Inc., PQ East 65th St, Inc., PQ East 77th, Inc., PQ East 83rd St, Inc., PQ Encino Bakery, Inc., PQ First Inc., PQ French Market, Inc., PQ Georgetown Inc., PQ Gold Coast, Inc., PQ Granary, Inc., PQ Greenwich, Inc., PQ Harbor Point, Inc., PQ Larchmont, Inc., PQ Lexington, Inc., PQ Lincoln Park, Inc., PQ Lincoln Square, Inc., PQ Manhattan Beach, Inc., PQ Meatpacking District, Inc., PQ Melrose, Inc., PQ Merrifield, Inc., PQ Mineral Springs, Inc., PQ Montague, Inc., PQ Mt. Vernon, Inc., PQ New Canaan, Inc., PQ New York, Inc., PQ Newport Beach Bakery, Inc., PQ Operations, Inc., PQ Park & 33rd, Inc., PQ Park Slope, Inc., PQ Robertson, Inc., PQ Rye, Inc., PQ San Vicente, Inc., PQ Santa Monica, Inc., PQ Soho, LLC, PQ Spring Valley, Inc., PQ Studio City, Inc., PQ The Village at Topanga, Inc., PQ Tribeca, Inc., PQ Tysons Corner, Inc., PQ UN, Inc., PQ Union Square, Inc., PQ Union Station, Inc., PQ Upper West, Inc., PQ Villa Marina, Inc., PQ Walnut Street, Inc., PQ Wayne, Inc., PQ West 72nd, Inc., PQ West 84th, Inc., PQ Westlake, Inc., PQ Wildwood, Inc., Tuxedo Bakery, Inc., Walnut St. Bakery, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition .Receipt # 92719 Fee Amount $1717. Filed by LPQ Garden City, Inc.. (Collins, Mark) Modified on 5/29/2020 (COH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan Joseph Schlauch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Collins Esq.