This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/13/2022 at 06:30:33 (UTC).

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union v. Thom

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Los Angeles Federal Credit Union filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Thom. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H. Yun. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-01017

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Scott H. Yun

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Los Angeles Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Clayton D Thom

Claremont, CA 91711

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alana B Anaya

Attorney at Anaya Law Group

2629 Townsgate Road, Suite 140

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorney

Leslie A Cohen

Attorney at Leslie Cohen Law PC

1615-A Montana Ave

Santa Monica, CA 90403

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

AP Coversheet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

AP-Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Service Executed on Clayton D Thom 3/14/2022 (Anaya, Alana) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Hearing Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom). (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Opposition to (related document(s): #5 Notice of Hearing (AP Case) filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom) Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Anaya, Alana) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Opposition to (related document(s): #5 Notice of Hearing (AP Case) filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom) Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Anaya, Alana) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom) The Hearing date is set for 8/3/2022 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Hearing Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom). (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Clayton D Thom (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Service Executed on Clayton D Thom 3/14/2022 (Anaya, Alana) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Clayton D Thom Date Issued 3/14/2022, Answer Due 4/13/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Federal Credit Union) Status hearing to be held on 6/16/2022 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 6:22-ap-01017-SY) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54033826. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 6:22-ap-01017. Complaint by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union against Clayton D Thom. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 AP Coversheet) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Anaya, Alana) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie A Cohen