This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 12:50:10 (UTC).

Longview Power, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Longview Power, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brendan Linehan Shannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-10951

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brendan Linehan Shannon

 

Party Details

Debtor

Longview Power, LLC

1375 Fort Martin Road

Maidsville, WV 26541

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.

6201 15Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Laura Krucks

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

David Seligman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Brenton Rogers

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Stephen C. Hackney

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Brendan Joseph Schlauch

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph M. Graham

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel J. DeFranceschi

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

One Rodney Square, P.O. Box 551

Wilmington, DE 19899

Zachary I Shapiro

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

920 North King Street, P.O. Box 551

Wilmington, DE 19801

Megan Kenney

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Agenda for Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for April 15, 2020, at 11:00 A.M.; and Notice of Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#30, #31) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#40

(#40) Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Brett M. Neve of Latham & Watkins LLP. Receipt Number 2899373, Filed by Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#39

(#39) Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Adam J. Goldberg of Latham & Watkins LLP. Receipt Number 2820844, Filed by Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#36

(#36) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of a. Disclosure Statement, Dated April 13, 2020; b. Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization; c. Class 3 Ballot for Accepting or Rejecting the Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#15, #16) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#35

(#35) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Kyle R. Kistinger. Receipt Number 0311-28990, Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders. (MacKenzie, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#31

(#41) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Agenda for Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for April 15, 2020, at 11:00 A.M.; and Notice of Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#30, #31) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#30

(#41) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Agenda for Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for April 15, 2020, at 11:00 A.M.; and Notice of Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#30, #31) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#16

(#36) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of a. Disclosure Statement, Dated April 13, 2020; b. Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization; c. Class 3 Ballot for Accepting or Rejecting the Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#15, #16) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#15

(#36) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of a. Disclosure Statement, Dated April 13, 2020; b. Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization; c. Class 3 Ballot for Accepting or Rejecting the Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#15, #16) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#10

(#10) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Prepetition and Postpetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#9

(#9) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Their Insurance Policies and Honor All Obligations in Respect Thereof, (B) Renew, Supplement, and Enter Into New Insurance Policies, (C) Honor the Terms of the Premium Financing Agreements and Pay Premiums Thereunder, and (D) Enter Into New Premium Financing Agreements in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Motion to Pay Employee Wages (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Expenses and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs, and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (Shapiro, Zachary) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#7

(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Accounts Payable Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to All Undisputed Obligations on Account of Outstanding Orders, and (III) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management System, (B) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (C) Perform Intercompany Transactions, and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Postpetition Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion (Declaration of Jeffery L. Keffer, Chief Executive Officer of Longview Power, LLC in Support of First Day Motions) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Longview Intermediate Holdings C, LLC, Longview Power, LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Longview Power, LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Agenda for Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for April 15, 2020, at 11:00 A.M.; and Notice of Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#30, #31) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Brett M. Neve of Latham & Watkins LLP. Receipt Number 2899373, Filed by Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Adam J. Goldberg of Latham & Watkins LLP. Receipt Number 2820844, Filed by Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#38) The transcriber has withdrawn the standing order for hearings in this case at the request of counsel.Terminating Reliable Companies. (RE: related document(s) 37 ). (Reliable Companies) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#37) (WITHDRAWN ON 4/14/20 - SEE DOCKET NO. 38 ) The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies. Telephone number 302-654-8080.. (Reliable Companies) Modified on 4/15/2020 (SJS). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of a. Disclosure Statement, Dated April 13, 2020; b. Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization; c. Class 3 Ballot for Accepting or Rejecting the Debtors' Joint Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization. Filed by DONLIN RECANO & CO.. (related document(s)#15, #16) (Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Kyle R. Kistinger. Receipt Number 0311-28990, Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders. (MacKenzie, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Laura E. Appleby. Receipt Number 0311-28990, Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders. (MacKenzie, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Motion to Appear pro hac vice James H. Millar. Receipt Number 0311-28990, Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders. (MacKenzie, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney James H, Millar and Kaitlin MacKenzie for Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders, Laura E. Appleby and Kaitlin MacKenzie for Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders, Kyle R. Kistinger and Kaitlin MacKenzie for Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders added to case Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders. (MacKenzie, Kaitlin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Prepetition and Postpetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Their Insurance Policies and Honor All Obligations in Respect Thereof, (B) Renew, Supplement, and Enter Into New Insurance Policies, (C) Honor the Terms of the Premium Financing Agreements and Pay Premiums Thereunder, and (D) Enter Into New Premium Financing Agreements in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Pay Employee Wages (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Expenses and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs, and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (Shapiro, Zachary) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Accounts Payable Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to All Undisputed Obligations on Account of Outstanding Orders, and (III) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management System, (B) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (C) Perform Intercompany Transactions, and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Postpetition Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion (Declaration of Jeffery L. Keffer, Chief Executive Officer of Longview Power, LLC in Support of First Day Motions) Filed By Longview Power, LLC (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Longview Intermediate Holdings C, LLC, Longview Power, LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-10951) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9721123, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Longview Power, LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. DeFranceschi