This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 01/01/2021 at 06:38:12 (UTC).

LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-42237

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC

9101 Lbj Freeway, Suite 650

Dallas, TX 75243

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gary G. Lyon

6401 W. Eldorado Parkway, Suite 234

Mckinney, TX 75070

Us Trustee Attorney

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC Document Due 12/17/2020. (Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Approving The Employment of Gary G. Lyon (RE: related document(s)#6 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon as Counsel for the Debtor/Debtor-in-Possession Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel # 2 Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (pr)). Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Approving The Employment of Gary G. Lyon (RE: related document(s)#6 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon as Counsel for the Debtor/Debtor-in-Possession Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel # 2 Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (pr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #3

Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix

6 #2

Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd)). Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 3/2/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/3/2021. (pr)). Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 3/2/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/3/2021. (pr) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC, Document Due 11/9/2020.(Lyon, Gary) Modified on 11/3/2020 (pr). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Electronic Filing (Original) In Re: (RE: related document(s)#9 Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC Document Due 12/17/2020. filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (dc) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC Document Due 12/17/2020. (Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Approving The Employment of Gary G. Lyon (RE: related document(s)#6 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon as Counsel for the Debtor/Debtor-in-Possession Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel # 2 Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (pr)). Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Not Concluded On 12/4/2020 Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Approving The Employment of Gary G. Lyon (RE: related document(s)#6 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon as Counsel for the Debtor/Debtor-in-Possession Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel # 2 Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (pr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application to Employ Gary G Lyon as Counsel for the Debtor/Debtor-in-Possession Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of proposed counsel #2 Service List Exhibit B - Mailing Matrix #3 Proposed Order) (Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC, Document Due 11/9/2020.(Lyon, Gary) Modified on 11/3/2020 (pr). filed by Debtor LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC). (dc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd)). Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 3/2/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/3/2021. (pr)). Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 3/2/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/3/2021. (pr) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-42237) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11820099, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by LOCATE 1 PLUS, INC, Document Due 11/9/2020.(Lyon, Gary) Modified on 11/3/2020 (pr). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal