This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 02/26/2022 at 05:19:12 (UTC).

Lisa A. Foss

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Lisa A Foss was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-10719

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Lisa A. Foss

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Lisa A. Foss Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/11/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/11/2022. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 03/11/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/11/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/11/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/11/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/11/2022. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 03/11/2022. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 03/11/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/11/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 03/11/2022. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/11/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/11/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/11/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 03/11/2022. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lisa A. Foss. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/6/2022 at 08:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 4/20/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proofs of Claims due by 5/6/2022. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/6/2022 at 08:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 4/20/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proofs of Claims due by 5/6/2022. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lisa A. Foss. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Lisa A. Foss. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 6:22-bk-10719) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53982229. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Lisa A. Foss Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/11/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/11/2022. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 03/11/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/11/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/11/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/11/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/11/2022. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 03/11/2022. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 03/11/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/11/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 03/11/2022. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 03/11/2022. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/11/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/11/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/11/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 03/11/2022. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Jay Berger