This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/06/2022 at 09:19:14 (UTC).

Liquor 369 Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Liquor 369 Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Grace E. Robson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-01269

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Grace E. Robson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Liquor 369 Inc.

2301 State Road 524, Suite 100

Cocoa, FL 32926

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

Trustee

Robert Altman

Palatka, FL 32178-0922

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aldo G Bartolone, Jr

Attorney at Bartolone Law, PLLC

1030 North Orange Avenue, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) Modified on 05/10/2022 (Nita) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#15

(#15) Schedules A - H, Summary of Assets & Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, List of Equity Security Holders and Declaration Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#14

(#14) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dana L Robbins on behalf of Creditor Cocoa Commons Station, LLC. (Robbins, Dana) Modified on 05/10/2022 (Nita) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#12

(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #9)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#11

(#11) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#13

(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

#10

Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 6:22-bk-01268-GER. (related document(s)#10). (Bonilla, Adrienne) Modified on 5/10/2022 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#9

(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #9)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#8

(#11) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

7 #2

Exhibit Verified Statement

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 6:22-bk-01268 with 6:22-bk-01269 Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#5

(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Ahyen) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.) List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Liquor 369 Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/6/2022. (Bartolone, Aldo) Modified on 4/8/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERROR NOTIFICATION to Aldo Bartolone for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, (related document(s) #16). (Nita) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERROR NOTIFICATION to Dana Robbins for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, (related document(s) #14). (Nita) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) Modified on 05/10/2022 (Nita) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Schedules A - H, Summary of Assets & Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, List of Equity Security Holders and Declaration Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dana L Robbins on behalf of Creditor Cocoa Commons Station, LLC. (Robbins, Dana) Modified on 05/10/2022 (Nita) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #9)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 6:22-bk-01268-GER. (related document(s)#10). (Bonilla, Adrienne) Modified on 5/10/2022 (Vivianne). (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/9/2022 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 6/16/2022. (Ahyen) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Robert Altman. Robert Altman added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Room Telephonic Conference Line: 877-801-2055 (participant passcode: 8940738#). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement) (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 6:22-bk-01268 with 6:22-bk-01269 Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2022 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Grace E. Robson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Ahyen) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Liquor 369 Inc.. (Ahyen) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 6:22-bk-01269) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A69750953, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.) List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Liquor 369 Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/6/2022. (Bartolone, Aldo) Modified on 4/8/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky