This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 01/26/2022 at 09:11:42 (UTC).

Limetree Bay Services, LLC and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Limetree Bay Services, LLC and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-32351

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtors

Limetree Bay Services, LLC

11100 Brittmoore Park Drive

Houston, TX 77041

Limetree Bay Refining Holdings, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Refining Holdings II, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Refining Operating, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Refining Marketing, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Aveste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jorian L. Rose

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Elizabeth A Green

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S. Orange Ave.

Suntrust Center, SU 2300

Jimmy D. Parrish

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Aveste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Marty L Brimmage

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2300 N. Field Streetsuite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Us Trustee Attorneys

Hector Duran, Jr

Attorney at U.S. Trustee

515 Ruskste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Jana Smith Whitworth

Attorney at Office of United States Trustee

515 Rusk Street, Suite 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Steven William Golden

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael D Warner

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

440 Louisiana Streetsuite 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1117

(#1117) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1089 Application for Compensation, #1090 Application for Compensation) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#1116

(#1116) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1078 Notice, #1079 Notice) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#1115

(#1115) Stipulation By Limetree Bay Services, LLC and West Indies Petroleum Limited and Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation Company, LLLP and the United States Virgin Islands. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ).(Related document(s):#1085 Stipulation) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#1114

(#1114) Corrected Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists. Filed by J. Aron & Company LLC (Chiu, Kevin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#1090

(#1117) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1089 Application for Compensation, #1090 Application for Compensation) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#1089

(#1117) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1089 Application for Compensation, #1090 Application for Compensation) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#1085

(#1115) Stipulation By Limetree Bay Services, LLC and West Indies Petroleum Limited and Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation Company, LLLP and the United States Virgin Islands. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ).(Related document(s):#1085 Stipulation) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#1079

(#1116) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1078 Notice, #1079 Notice) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#1078

(#1116) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1078 Notice, #1079 Notice) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

4 #1

Main Document

#3

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

1,906 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1117) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1089 Application for Compensation, #1090 Application for Compensation) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1116) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1078 Notice, #1079 Notice) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1115) Stipulation By Limetree Bay Services, LLC and West Indies Petroleum Limited and Port Hamilton Refining and Transportation Company, LLLP and the United States Virgin Islands. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ).(Related document(s):#1085 Stipulation) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1114) Corrected Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists. Filed by J. Aron & Company LLC (Chiu, Kevin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1113) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists. Filed by J. Aron & Company LLC (Chiu, Kevin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Email Notice. Contacted Vincent Alexander. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court (Related document(s):#868 Motion for Relief From Stay) Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone and video conference (aalo) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1112) Notice of Closing of Sale. (Related document(s):#977 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) Filed by Limetree Bay Services, LLC (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1111) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1084 Response) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1110) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1066 Order on Emergency Motion, #1067 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1109) Certificate of Service (Filed By BMC Group, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#1051 Agenda) (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,126 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Emergency Motion , Application to Employ BMC Group, Inc. as Claims, Noticing, Solicitation and Administrative Agent. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Limetree Bay Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 03:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Claims Agent Agreement #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tinamaire Feil) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration re: Declaration of Mark Shapiro in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Organization Chart #2 Exhibit B - Pully Resume) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Complex Case Creditor Matrix (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Michael T. Delaney. Filed by Debtor Limetree Bay Services, LLC (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Jorian L. Rose. Filed by Debtor Limetree Bay Services, LLC (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Joint Administration, Emergency Motion Filed by Debtor Limetree Bay Services, LLC Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2021 at 03:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven Ordaz Filed by on behalf of BMC Group, Inc. (Ordaz, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By Limetree Bay Services, LLC ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-32351) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23142100. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Limetree Bay Services, LLC. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven William Golden