This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 02/22/2022 at 06:02:15 (UTC).

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC v. Cotton et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Limetree Bay Refining, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Cotton. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-AP-03791

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Defendants

Cotton

Beecher Cotton

Pamela Colon

Sirdina Isaac-Joseph

Esther Clifford

Sylvia Browne

Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza

Francis E. Charles

Theresa J. Charles

Helen Shirley

Anisha Hendricks

Cristel Rodriguez

Josie Barnes

Arleen Miller

Rosalba Estevez

Isidore Jules

John Sonson

Virginie George

Clifford Boynes

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A Green

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S. Orange Ave.

Suntrust Center, SU 2300

Jimmy D. Parrish

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Jorian L. Rose

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorneys

Rhea Regina Lawrence

Attorney at Lee J. Rohn and Associates, LLC

1108 King Street, Suite 3

Christiansted, VI 00820

Lee J Rohn

Attorney at Lee J. Rohn and Associates, LLC

1108 King Street, Suite 3

St. Croix, VI 00820

Joel M. Walker

Attorney at Nye, Stirling, Hale & Miller LLP

1145 Bower Hill Road, Suite 104

Pittsburgh, PA 15243

John K Dema

1236 Strand St, Ste1`03

Christiansted, VI 00820

Warren Tavares Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

900 Jackson Street, Ste 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Tristan E Manthey

Attorney at Fishman Haygood LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#127

(#127) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#126 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/31/2021)

#126

(#126) Stipulation and Agreed Order Adopting Water Distribution Program Signed on 10/29/2021 (Related document(s):#125 Stipulation) (emiller) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#125

(#125) Stipulation By Limetree Bay Refining, LLC and the Debtors, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC and the Plaintiffs. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Limetree Bay Refining, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#124

(#124) Summons Service Executed on Josie Barnes 9/20/2021; Rosalba Estevez 9/20/2021; Virginie George 9/20/2021; Anisha Hendricks 9/20/2021; Isidore Jules 9/20/2021; Arleen Miller 9/20/2021; Cristel Rodriguez 9/20/2021; Helen Shirley 9/20/2021; John Sonson 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#123

(#123) Summons Service Executed on Delia Almestica 9/20/2021; Anne Marie John Baptiste 9/20/2021; Leoba John Baptiste 9/20/2021; Clifford Boynes 9/20/2021; Warrington Chapman 9/20/2021; Carlos Christian 9/20/2021; Christopher Christian 9/20/2021; Mervyn Constantine 9/20/2021; Neal Davis 9/20/2021; Rochelle Gomez 9/20/2021; Joan Mathurin 9/20/2021; Myrna Mathurin 9/20/2021; Aaron G. Maynard 9/20/2021; Verne McSween 9/20/2021; Anna Rexach-Constantine 9/20/2021; Edna Santiago 9/20/2021; Margaret Thompson 9/20/2021; Guidrycia Wells 9/20/2021; O'Shay Wells 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#122

(#122) Summons Service Executed on Francis E. Charles 9/20/2021; Theresa J. Charles 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#121

(#121) Summons Service Executed on Sylvia Browne 9/20/2021; Esther Clifford 9/20/2021; Pamela Colon 9/20/2021; Beecher Cotton 9/20/2021; Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza 9/20/2021; Sirdina Isaac-Joseph 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#120

(#120) Summons Issued on Delia Almestica Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anne Marie John Baptiste Date Issued 9/16/2021; Leoba John Baptiste Date Issued 9/16/2021; Josie Barnes Date Issued 9/16/2021; Clifford Boynes Date Issued 9/16/2021; Sylvia Browne Date Issued 9/16/2021; Warrington Chapman Date Issued 9/16/2021; Francis E. Charles Date Issued 9/16/2021; Theresa J. Charles Date Issued 9/16/2021; Carlos Christian Date Issued 9/16/2021; Christopher Christian Date Issued 9/16/2021; Esther Clifford Date Issued 9/16/2021; Pamela Colon Date Issued 9/16/2021; Mervyn Constantine Date Issued 9/16/2021; Beecher Cotton Date Issued 9/16/2021; Neal Davis Date Issued 9/16/2021; Rosalba Estevez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Virginie George Date Issued 9/16/2021; Rochelle Gomez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anisha Hendricks Date Issued 9/16/2021; Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza Date Issued 9/16/2021; Sirdina Isaac-Joseph Date Issued 9/16/2021; Isidore Jules Date Issued 9/16/2021; Joan Mathurin Date Issued 9/16/2021; Myrna Mathurin Date Issued 9/16/2021; Aaron G. Maynard Date Issued 9/16/2021; Verne McSween Date Issued 9/16/2021; Arleen Miller Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anna Rexach-Constantine Date Issued 9/16/2021; Cristel Rodriguez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Edna Santiago Date Issued 9/16/2021; Helen Shirley Date Issued 9/16/2021; John Sonson Date Issued 9/16/2021; Margaret Thompson Date Issued 9/16/2021; Guidrycia Wells Date Issued 9/16/2021; O'Shay Wells Date Issued 9/16/2021. (hler) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#119

(#119) Request for Issuance of Summons on BEECHER COTTON, PAMELA COLON, SIRDINA ISAAC JOSEPH, ESTHER CLIFFORD, SYLVIA BROWNE, ALVINA JEAN MARIE ILARRAZA, FRANCIS E. CHARLES, THERESA J. CHARLES, HELEN SHIRLEY, ANISHA HENDRICKS, CRISTEL RODRIGUEZ, JOSIE BARNES, ARLEEN MILLER, ROSALBA ESTEVEZ, ISIDORE JULES, JOHN SONSON, VIRGINIE GEORGE, CLIFFORD BOYNES, CHRISTOPHER CHRISTIAN, MARGARET THOMPSON, DELIA ALMESTICA, CARLOS CHRISTIAN, ANNA REXACH-CONSTANTINE, MERVYN CONSTANTINE, NEAL DAVIS, EDNA SANTIAGO, GUIDRYCIA WELLS, OSHAY WELLS, AARON G. MAYNARD, VERNE MCSWEEN, ROCHELLE GOMEZ, MYRNA MATHURIN, JOAN MATHURIN, LEOBA JOHN BAPTISTE, WARRINGTON CHAPMAN, AND ANNE MARIE JOHN BAPTISTE. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #3

Exhibit B - Virgin Islands Order

#2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

1 #2

Adversary Case Cover Sheet

#1

Main Document

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#126 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) Stipulation and Agreed Order Adopting Water Distribution Program Signed on 10/29/2021 (Related document(s):#125 Stipulation) (emiller) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) Stipulation By Limetree Bay Refining, LLC and the Debtors, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC and the Plaintiffs. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Limetree Bay Refining, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) Summons Service Executed on Josie Barnes 9/20/2021; Rosalba Estevez 9/20/2021; Virginie George 9/20/2021; Anisha Hendricks 9/20/2021; Isidore Jules 9/20/2021; Arleen Miller 9/20/2021; Cristel Rodriguez 9/20/2021; Helen Shirley 9/20/2021; John Sonson 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) Summons Service Executed on Delia Almestica 9/20/2021; Anne Marie John Baptiste 9/20/2021; Leoba John Baptiste 9/20/2021; Clifford Boynes 9/20/2021; Warrington Chapman 9/20/2021; Carlos Christian 9/20/2021; Christopher Christian 9/20/2021; Mervyn Constantine 9/20/2021; Neal Davis 9/20/2021; Rochelle Gomez 9/20/2021; Joan Mathurin 9/20/2021; Myrna Mathurin 9/20/2021; Aaron G. Maynard 9/20/2021; Verne McSween 9/20/2021; Anna Rexach-Constantine 9/20/2021; Edna Santiago 9/20/2021; Margaret Thompson 9/20/2021; Guidrycia Wells 9/20/2021; O'Shay Wells 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) Summons Service Executed on Francis E. Charles 9/20/2021; Theresa J. Charles 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) Summons Service Executed on Sylvia Browne 9/20/2021; Esther Clifford 9/20/2021; Pamela Colon 9/20/2021; Beecher Cotton 9/20/2021; Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza 9/20/2021; Sirdina Isaac-Joseph 9/20/2021. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Summons Issued on Delia Almestica Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anne Marie John Baptiste Date Issued 9/16/2021; Leoba John Baptiste Date Issued 9/16/2021; Josie Barnes Date Issued 9/16/2021; Clifford Boynes Date Issued 9/16/2021; Sylvia Browne Date Issued 9/16/2021; Warrington Chapman Date Issued 9/16/2021; Francis E. Charles Date Issued 9/16/2021; Theresa J. Charles Date Issued 9/16/2021; Carlos Christian Date Issued 9/16/2021; Christopher Christian Date Issued 9/16/2021; Esther Clifford Date Issued 9/16/2021; Pamela Colon Date Issued 9/16/2021; Mervyn Constantine Date Issued 9/16/2021; Beecher Cotton Date Issued 9/16/2021; Neal Davis Date Issued 9/16/2021; Rosalba Estevez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Virginie George Date Issued 9/16/2021; Rochelle Gomez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anisha Hendricks Date Issued 9/16/2021; Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza Date Issued 9/16/2021; Sirdina Isaac-Joseph Date Issued 9/16/2021; Isidore Jules Date Issued 9/16/2021; Joan Mathurin Date Issued 9/16/2021; Myrna Mathurin Date Issued 9/16/2021; Aaron G. Maynard Date Issued 9/16/2021; Verne McSween Date Issued 9/16/2021; Arleen Miller Date Issued 9/16/2021; Anna Rexach-Constantine Date Issued 9/16/2021; Cristel Rodriguez Date Issued 9/16/2021; Edna Santiago Date Issued 9/16/2021; Helen Shirley Date Issued 9/16/2021; John Sonson Date Issued 9/16/2021; Margaret Thompson Date Issued 9/16/2021; Guidrycia Wells Date Issued 9/16/2021; O'Shay Wells Date Issued 9/16/2021. (hler) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Request for Issuance of Summons on BEECHER COTTON, PAMELA COLON, SIRDINA ISAAC JOSEPH, ESTHER CLIFFORD, SYLVIA BROWNE, ALVINA JEAN MARIE ILARRAZA, FRANCIS E. CHARLES, THERESA J. CHARLES, HELEN SHIRLEY, ANISHA HENDRICKS, CRISTEL RODRIGUEZ, JOSIE BARNES, ARLEEN MILLER, ROSALBA ESTEVEZ, ISIDORE JULES, JOHN SONSON, VIRGINIE GEORGE, CLIFFORD BOYNES, CHRISTOPHER CHRISTIAN, MARGARET THOMPSON, DELIA ALMESTICA, CARLOS CHRISTIAN, ANNA REXACH-CONSTANTINE, MERVYN CONSTANTINE, NEAL DAVIS, EDNA SANTIAGO, GUIDRYCIA WELLS, OSHAY WELLS, AARON G. MAYNARD, VERNE MCSWEEN, ROCHELLE GOMEZ, MYRNA MATHURIN, JOAN MATHURIN, LEOBA JOHN BAPTISTE, WARRINGTON CHAPMAN, AND ANNE MARIE JOHN BAPTISTE. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#111 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued on Delia Almestica Date Issued 7/29/2021; Anne Marie John Baptiste Date Issued 7/29/2021; Leoba John Baptiste Date Issued 7/29/2021; Josie Barnes Date Issued 7/29/2021; Clifford Boynes Date Issued 7/29/2021; Sylvia Browne Date Issued 7/29/2021; Warrington Chapman Date Issued 7/29/2021; Francis E. Charles Date Issued 7/29/2021; Theresa J. Charles Date Issued 7/29/2021; Carlos Christian Date Issued 7/29/2021; Christopher Christian Date Issued 7/29/2021; Esther Clifford Date Issued 7/29/2021; Pamela Colon Date Issued 7/29/2021; Mervyn Constantine Date Issued 7/29/2021; Beecher Cotton Date Issued 7/29/2021; Neal Davis Date Issued 7/29/2021; Rosalba Estevez Date Issued 7/29/2021; Virginie George Date Issued 7/29/2021; Rochelle Gomez Date Issued 7/29/2021; Anisha Hendricks Date Issued 7/29/2021; Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza Date Issued 7/29/2021; Sirdina Isaac-Joseph Date Issued 7/29/2021; Isidore Jules Date Issued 7/29/2021; Joan Mathurin Date Issued 7/29/2021; Myrna Mathurin Date Issued 7/29/2021; Aaron G. Maynard Date Issued 7/29/2021; Verne McSween Date Issued 7/29/2021; Arleen Miller Date Issued 7/29/2021; Anna Rexach-Constantine Date Issued 7/29/2021; Cristel Rodriguez Date Issued 7/29/2021; Edna Santiago Date Issued 7/29/2021; Helen Shirley Date Issued 7/29/2021; John Sonson Date Issued 7/29/2021; Margaret Thompson Date Issued 7/29/2021; Guidrycia Wells Date Issued 7/29/2021; O'Shay Wells Date Issued 7/29/2021. (GabrielleClair) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Setting Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/28/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Service (Filed By Limetree Bay Refining, LLC ).(Related document(s):#1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Emergency Motion (Adversary), #3 Order Setting Hearing) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons on BEECHER COTTON, PAMELA COLON, SIRDINA ISAAC JOSEPH, ESTHER CLIFFORD, SYLVIA BROWNE, ALVINA JEAN MARIE ILARRAZA, FRANCIS E. CHARLES, THERESA J. CHARLES, HELEN SHIRLEY, ANISHA HENDRICKS, CRISTEL RODRIGUEZ, JOSIE BARNES, ARLEEN MILLER, ROSALBA ESTEVEZ, ISIDORE JULES, JOHN SONSON, VIRGINIE GEORGE, CLIFFORD BOYNES, CHRISTOPHER CHRISTIAN, MARGARET THOMPSON, DELIA ALMESTICA, CARLOS CHRISTIAN, ANNA REXACH-CONSTANTINE, MERVYN CONSTANTINE, NEAL DAVIS, EDNA SANTIAGO, GUIDRYCIA WELLS, OSHAY WELLS, AARON G. MAYNARD, VERNE MCSWEEN, ROCHELLE GOMEZ, MYRNA MATHURIN, JOAN MATHURIN, LEOBA JOHN BAPTISTE, WARRINGTON CHAPMAN, AND ANNE MARIE JOHN BAPTISTE. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tristan E Manthey Filed by on behalf of Delia Almestica, Anne Marie John Baptiste, Leoba John Baptiste, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Christopher Christian, Mervyn Constantine, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G. Maynard, Verne McSween, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Manthey, Tristan) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Extending the Automatic Stay and Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief, Halting the Prosecution of the Class Action Against Debtor and Non-Debtor Defendants for 14 Days in the Virgin Islands Class Actions Signed on 7/26/2021 (Related document(s):#2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Emergency Motion (Adversary)) Hearing scheduled for 8/6/2021 at 10:30 AM by telephone and video conference. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 21-03791) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23171763. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Emergency Motion to Extend the Automatic Stay and, Additionally or in the Alternative, Grant Preliminary Injunctive Relief, Halting the Prosecution of the Class Action Against Debtor and Non-Debtor Defendants for 60 Days Filed by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Virgin Islands Order) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 21-03791. Nature of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC against Beecher Cotton, Pamela Colon, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph, Esther Clifford, Sylvia Browne, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Francis E. Charles, Theresa J. Charles, Helen Shirley, Anisha Hendricks, Cristel Rodriguez, Josie Barnes, Arleen Miller, Rosalba Estevez, Isidore Jules, John Sonson, Virginie George, Clifford Boynes, Christopher Christian, Margaret Thompson, Delia Almestica, Carlos Christian, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Mervyn Constantine, Neal Davis, Edna Santiago, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells, Aaron G. Maynard, Verne McSween, Rochelle Gomez, Myrna Mathurin, Joan Mathurin, Leoba John Baptiste, Warrington Chapman, Anne Marie John Baptiste. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Adversary Case Cover Sheet) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cotton is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel M. Walker