This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/14/2022 at 05:59:31 (UTC).

Limetree Bay Refining Holdings II, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Limetree Bay Refining Holdings II, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-32353

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

Limetree Bay Refining Holdings II, LLC

1 Estate Hope

Christiansted, VI 00820

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Elizabeth A Green

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S. Orange Ave.

Suntrust Center, SU 2300

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-32351 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 21-32351. Signed on 7/13/2021 (aaloadi) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-32353) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23142100. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Limetree Bay Refining Holdings II, LLC. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth A. Green