This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:11:22 (UTC).

Lillie W. Predom

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Lillie W Predom was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-16291

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Lillie W. Predom

Rialto, CA 92377

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William J Smyth

Attorney at Smyth Law Office

4929 Wilshire Blvd Ste 690

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Lillie W. Predom (Smyth, William) WARNING: See docket entry number 9 for corrective action. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Denson, Latisha). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#8

(#8) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/28/2018 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objection 523 Complaint Due: 10/29/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 9/27/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/15/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/11/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Denson, Latisha) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#10

(#10) CHAPTER 13 PROCEDURES ORDER Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/19/2019 (RE: related document(s)#2 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • (#12) Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Auto VAN-105) (BNC). (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#2 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom) Status hearing to be held on 8/28/2019 at 02:30 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CHAPTER 13 PROCEDURES ORDER Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/19/2019 (RE: related document(s)#2 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judge/Trustee was reassigned due to prior related case 6:19-bk-12985WJ. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom) (Denson, Latisha) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/28/2018 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objection 523 Complaint Due: 10/29/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 9/27/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/15/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/11/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Denson, Latisha) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Judge Wayne E. Johnson added to case due to prior related case 6:19-bk-12985WJ. Involvement of Judge Mark D. Houle Terminated (Denson, Latisha) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:19-bk-16291) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49422510. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 09/27/2019. (Smyth, William) WARNING: Notice not generated thru BNC due to reassignment of case. See docket entry number 8 for correct notice. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Denson, Latisha). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Lillie W. Predom. (Smyth, William) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Lillie W. Predom (Smyth, William) WARNING: See docket entry number 9 for corrective action. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Denson, Latisha). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.