This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/08/2022 at 06:30:49 (UTC).

LIGCEDB LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 LIGCEDB LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10567

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

LIGCEDB LLC

17729 Chatsworth Street

Granada Hills, CA 91344

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Thomas B Ure

Attorney at Ure Law Firm

800 West 6Th Street, Ste. 940

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Us Trustee Attorney

Russell Clementson

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Thomas B. Ure as General Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#37

(#37) Statement Of Disinterestedness For Employment of Professional Person Under FRBP 2014 Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#35

(#35) Amending Schedules (E/F) Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#34

(#34) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#33 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#33

(#33) Order - Scheduling Order 1) Setting Claims Bar Date; 2) Setting Continued Status Conference. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 6/21/2022 (PG) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#32

(#32) Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim in a Chapter 11 [LBR 3001-1] Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#31

(#31) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#30 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/19/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/19/2022)

#30

(#30) Order Continuing Chapter 11 Status Conference (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #10 ) Signed on 6/17/2022 (JC) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Thomas B. Ure as General Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Statement Of Disinterestedness For Employment of Professional Person Under FRBP 2014 Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#36) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). 341(a) Meeting Continued to 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. (Clementson, Russell) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)(# 1:22-bk-10567-MB) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54395891. Fee amount 32.00. (re: Doc#35) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Amending Schedules (E/F) Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#33 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order - Scheduling Order 1) Setting Claims Bar Date; 2) Setting Continued Status Conference. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 6/21/2022 (PG) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim in a Chapter 11 [LBR 3001-1] Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#30 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/19/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Order Continuing Chapter 11 Status Conference (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #10 ) Signed on 6/17/2022 (JC) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/8/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 9/7/2022. (AG1) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC) (RT) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC) (RT) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. (RE: related document(s)#3 Corp Resolution Auth Filing filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC) (RT) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC) (RT) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC) Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/23/2022. (RT) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 1:22-bk-10567) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54226987. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC. (Ure, Thomas) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #5. Modified on 5/10/2022 (RT). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor LIGCEDB LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by LIGCEDB LLC Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/23/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 05/23/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 05/23/2022. CORRECTION: Deficient for Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/23/2022. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 5/23/2022. Not deficient for Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1). (Ure, Thomas) Modified on 5/10/2022 (RT). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clementson