This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/22/2020 at 05:14:20 (UTC).

Liberos LLC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Liberos LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Kwan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-17672

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Robert N. Kwan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Liberos LLC

1650 Veteran Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Elissa Miller (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Liberos LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/4/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/4/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/4/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/4/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/4/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/4/2020. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 09/4/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/4/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/4/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/4/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/4/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 09/4/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 09/4/2020.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/21/2020 (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/16/2020 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-17672) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51611309. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Liberos LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/4/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/4/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/4/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/4/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/4/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/4/2020. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 09/4/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/4/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/4/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/4/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/4/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 09/4/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 09/4/2020.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/21/2020 (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBEROS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Jay Berger