This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:18:34 (UTC).

Larry Kenneth Tuff

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Larry Kenneth Tuff in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-19027

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Larry Kenneth Tuff

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#3

(#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/4/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judge/Trustee was reassigned due to prior case 6:16-bk-13677-WJ. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Larry Kenneth Tuff) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/4/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Judge Wayne E. Johnson added to case due to prior related case 6:16-bk-13677-WJ. Involvement of Judge Scott H. Yun Terminated (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:19-bk-19027) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49920065. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Nisson, Peter)WARNING: Notice not generated thru BNC. See docket entry #3 for correct meeting of creditors notice. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Larry Kenneth Tuff. (Nisson, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Larry Kenneth Tuff Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Nisson, Peter)WARNING: See docket entry #4 for corrective action. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.