This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/11/2021 at 07:27:28 (UTC).

Lake Cecile Resort Inc

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Lake Cecile Resort Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-01060

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtor

Lake Cecile Resort Inc

8010 Firenze Blvd

Orlando, FL 32836

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

David R McFarlin

Attorney at Fisher Rushmer, PA

390 N Orange Avenue, Suite 2200

Orlando, FL 32801

Haynes Edward Brinson

Attorney at Brinson and Brinson

4636 W. Irlo Bronson Mem. Hwy

Kissimmee, FL 34746

Us Trustee Attorneys

Jill E Kelso

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

400 W. Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Bryan E Buenaventura

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office - Region 21

400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#86

#85

#84

#83

#82

#79

77 #3

Mailing Matrix

77 #2

Exhibit A

77 #1

Main Document

#75

#69

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#3

#1

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Order Directing Mediation Conducted by June 18, 2021.. Status Conference Hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay Scheduled (by Video Zoom) for 6/25/2021 at 01:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #83)). Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Mitchell W Mandler for Best Meridian Insurance Company and Best Meridian Insurance Company, SPC, a Cayman Islands Company. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded (Related Doc #75). Service Instructions: Kenneth Herron is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Order Directing Response Re: Application to Retain Walter C. Parsons, II and Fairwinds Consulting, LLC as Loan Broker (related document(s)#77). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Dianna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Order Granting Motion to Clarify Motion for Order Specifying Adequate Assurance of Payment or Post Petition Utility Services (Related Doc #69). Service Instructions: John Brennan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Debtor Lake Cecile Resort Inc (related document(s)#79). (McFarlin, David) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Proof of Service of Order Authorizing Employment of Special Counsel. Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Debtor Lake Cecile Resort Inc (related document(s)#78). (McFarlin, David) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Agreed Order Granting Motion For Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts (Related Doc #76). Service Instructions: David McFarlin is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Haynes Edward Brinson as Special Cousel for the Debtor (Related Doc #73). Service Instructions: David McFarlin is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Application to Retain Walter C. Parsons, II and Fairwinds Consulting, LLC as Loan Broker , with Verified Statement and Disclosure of Compensation Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Debtor Lake Cecile Resort Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Mailing Matrix) (McFarlin, David) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher R Thompson on behalf of Creditor Lake Cecile Ventures, LLC. (Thompson, Christopher) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Debtor Lake Cecile Resort Inc. (McFarlin, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary . (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2021 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 5/21/2021. (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Debtor Lake Cecile Resort Inc. (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-01060) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 66800650, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by David R McFarlin on behalf of Lake Cecile Resort Inc. (McFarlin, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE CECILE RESORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E Buenaventura

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill E Kelso