This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/09/2022 at 20:31:51 (UTC).

K&L Law Group, P.C. v. Woo

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 K L Law Group, P C filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Woo. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S Wallace and Scott C Clarkson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-AP-01043

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judges

Mark S Wallace

Scott C Clarkson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K&L Law Group, P.C.

Defendants

Steve Yuk Woo

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Steve Yuk Kin Woo

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Trustee

Jeffrey I Golden (TR)

Costa Mesa, CA 92628-2470

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Y Lazo

Attorney at K&L Law Group

2646 Dupont Drive., Suite 60340

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorney

Christopher P Walker

Attorney at Law Office of Christopher P. Walker, P.C

505 S Villa Real Dr Ste 103

Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#18

(#18) Order Further Continuing Pre-Trial Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Pre-Trial Conference Set For April 26, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. Pursuant To The Order Entered February 25, 2022 (Docket #16), Is Hereby FURTHER CONTINUED TO May 3, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. In Courtroom 5C-Virtual, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/21/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.). (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#17

(#17) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#16

(#16) Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Pre-Trial Conference Set For April 20, 2022, At 10:00 A.M. Is Hereby CONTINUED TO April 26, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. In Courtroom 5C-Virtual, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/25/2022. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#13

(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#12

(#12) Scheduling Order: All Discovery Shall Close on December 31, 2021. All Discovery Motions Shall be Heard Before January 31, 2022. ALl Pretrial Motions (Except Motions in Limine) Shall be Heard Before March 31, 2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for April 20, 2022 at 10:00 AM. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Signed on 10/4/2021 (Le, James) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/12/2021)

#8

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendant Steve Woo's Reply Brief to Plaintiff K&L's Opposition to Defendant Steve Woo's Motion to Dismiss K&L's Adversary Complaint; Supplemental Declaration of Steve Woo in Support Hereof (related document(s): #5 Opposition filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo (Le, James) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#5

(#6) Defendant Steve Woo's Reply Brief to Plaintiff K&L's Opposition to Defendant Steve Woo's Motion to Dismiss K&L's Adversary Complaint; Supplemental Declaration of Steve Woo in Support Hereof (related document(s): #5 Opposition filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo (Le, James) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#3

Declaration of Steve Yuk Kin Woo

3 #2

Declaration of Gary Polston

3 #1

Main Document

#2

AP-Summons

2 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Hearing Continued On Pre-Trial Conference (RE: related document #1 Complaint to Determine (1) Non-Dischargeability of Debt and Objection to Discharge of Debtor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(3), 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(2)(A) and (B) and 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(4)) - STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO AUGUST 2, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 5C-VIRTUAL, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701. STATUS REPORT DUE FOURTEEN (14) DAYS IN ADVANCE. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint To Determine (1) Non-Dischargeability Of Debt And Objection To Discharge Of Debtor Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(3), 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(2)(A) And (B) And 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(4)filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) - CONTINUED TO MAY 3, 2022 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM 5C-VIRTUAL, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701 PER ORDER FURTHER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ENTERED 3-21-2022 - (DOCKET NO. #18) The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Hearing Continued On Pre-Trial Conference To Determine (1) Non-Dischargeability Of Debt And Objection To Discharge Of Debtor Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(3), 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(2)(A) And (B) And 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(4) (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) - PRE-TRIAL HEARING CONTINUED TO APRIL 26, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 5C-VIRTUAL, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701 PER ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ENTERED 2-25-2022 - (DOCKET NO. #16). The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Further Continuing Pre-Trial Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Pre-Trial Conference Set For April 26, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. Pursuant To The Order Entered February 25, 2022 (Docket #16), Is Hereby FURTHER CONTINUED TO May 3, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. In Courtroom 5C-Virtual, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/21/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.). (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Pre-Trial Conference Set For April 20, 2022, At 10:00 A.M. Is Hereby CONTINUED TO April 26, 2022, At 11:00 A.M. In Courtroom 5C-Virtual, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/25/2022. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#15) In accordance with the Administrative Order 22-04 dated 2-10-22, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Mark S Wallace to Judge Scott C Clarkson. (Le, James) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Scheduling Order: All Discovery Shall Close on December 31, 2021. All Discovery Motions Shall be Heard Before January 31, 2022. ALl Pretrial Motions (Except Motions in Limine) Shall be Heard Before March 31, 2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for April 20, 2022 at 10:00 AM. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Signed on 10/4/2021 (Le, James) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Denying Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #3) Signed on 9/10/2021. (Le, James) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo) Motion Denied with Prejudice. Order by Respondent. (Le, James) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Steve Woo's Reply Brief to Plaintiff K&L's Opposition to Defendant Steve Woo's Motion to Dismiss K&L's Adversary Complaint; Supplemental Declaration of Steve Woo in Support Hereof (related document(s): #5 Opposition filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo (Le, James) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Opposition to (related document(s): #3 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo) Filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C. (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo) The Hearing date is set for 9/1/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Le, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding of K&L Law Group, PC Filed by Defendant Steve Yuk Kin Woo (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Polston #2 Declaration of Steve Yuk Kin Woo) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Steve Yuk Kin Woo Date Issued 7/7/2021, Answer Due 8/6/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff K&L Law Group, P.C.) Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Le, James) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 8:21-ap-01043-MW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53134676. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 8:21-ap-01043. Complaint by K&L Law Group, P.C., Steve Yuk Woo against Steve Yuk Woo. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (65 (Dischargeability - other)),(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Lazo, Marc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K&L LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant