This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/10/2022 at 06:30:45 (UTC).

Kimberly L Nguyen

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Kimberly L Nguyen was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mindy A Mora. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-13698

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mindy A Mora

 

Party Details

Debtor

Kimberly L Nguyen

West Palm Beach, FL 33405

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee

Soneet Kapila

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Brian K. McMahon, Esq.

1401 Forum Way, 6Th Floor

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee Attorney

Soneet Kapila

Attorney at www.kapilatrustee.com

Po Box 14213

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay to Pursue Appeal (Re: #30) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#44

(#44) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila (Re: #43 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#43

(#43) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Subchapter V Trustee's Motion to Require Debtor to Escrow Subchapter V Trustee Fees and Expenses (Re: #33) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#41

(#41) Status Report Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

40 #1

Main Document

#33

(#36) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila (Re: #33 Motion Subchapter V Trustee's Motion to Require Debtor to Escrow Subchapter V Trustee Fees and Expenses filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila, #35 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued). (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#30

(#37) Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(#30 Motion for Relief From Stay)] Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

23 #2

Exhibit A

23 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor: First date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/14/2022 at 08:30 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/15/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 7/20/2022. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/25/2022. Schedules A-J due 5/25/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/25/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/25/2022. Payment Advices due for Debtor 5/25/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/25/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

5 #2

Verified Statement

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by John P Arcia Filed by Creditor Global Management Trust LLC. (Arcia, John) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 07/20/2022. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay to Pursue Appeal (Re: #30) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila (Re: #43 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Subchapter V Trustee's Motion to Require Debtor to Escrow Subchapter V Trustee Fees and Expenses (Re: #33) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#42) Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Status Report Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Second Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled/Continued Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Re: #23 Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled). Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/15/2022 at 02:30 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Granting Application to Employ Debtor in Possession's Attorney (Re: #14) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Order Granting Ex Parte Agreed Motion To Continue Hearing On: (#30 Motion to Determine That Stay is Not Applicable or in the Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2022 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(#30 Motion for Relief From Stay)] Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila (Re: #33 Motion Subchapter V Trustee's Motion to Require Debtor to Escrow Subchapter V Trustee Fees and Expenses filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila, #35 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued). (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor: First date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/14/2022 at 08:30 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/15/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 7/20/2022. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/25/2022. Schedules A-J due 5/25/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/25/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/25/2022. Payment Advices due for Debtor 5/25/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/25/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice Appointing Soneet Kapila as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by John P Arcia Filed by Creditor Global Management Trust LLC. (Arcia, John) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-13698) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A40872870. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtor(s) Social Security Number(s) [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] Filed by Debtor Kimberly L Nguyen. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 07/20/2022. (McMahon, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Soneet Kapila