This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2021 at 06:31:11 (UTC).

KFF Holdings, Inc. v. California Bank and Trust

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 KFF Holdings, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against California Bank and Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott C Clarkson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-AP-01066

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Scott C Clarkson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KFF Holdings, Inc., fka Kendall Frozen Fruits, Inc., the REORGANIZED DEBTOR, Plaintiff

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

KFF Holdings, Inc.

Defendants

CALIFORNIA BANK AND TRUST, Defendant

San Diego, CA 92130

California Bank and Trust

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Judith E Marshack

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt Ave

Irvine, CA 92620

David Wood

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

Matthew Grimshaw

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

Defendant Attorney

Meghan C Murphey

Attorney at Murphey & Murphey A Professional Corp

120 Vantis Dr Ste 300

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656-2677

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

AP-Summons

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to Complaint Filed by California Bank and Trust. (Murphey, Meghan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#8 Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Approving Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendant California Bank And Trust To Respond To Complaint. IT IS ORDERED: Defendant Shall Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Reorganized Debtor's Complaint On Or Before Tuesday, September 28, 2021. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #6 ) Signed on 9/8/2021 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust. (Murphey, Meghan) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation By California Bank and Trust and KFF Holdings Inc., fka Kendall Frozen Fruits Inc. Filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust (Murphey, Meghan) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Service Executed on California Bank and Trust 8/12/2021 (Grimshaw, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Defendant re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff KFF Holdings, Inc.. (Grimshaw, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued on California Bank and Trust Date Issued 8/6/2021, Answer Due 9/7/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint) Status Conference hearing to be held on 11/3/2021 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C- Virtual, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect plaintiff/defendant/attorney/party information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint) (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 8:21-ap-01066. Complaint by KFF Holdings, Inc., fka Kendall Frozen Fruits, Inc., the Reorganized Debtor against California Bank and Trust. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for: (1) Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Actual Transfers [11 U.S.C. 548(a)(1)(A), 550, and 551]; (2)Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Actual Fraudulent Transfers [11 U.S.C. 544, 550 and 551]; (3) Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Constructive Fraudulent Transfers) [11 U.S.C. 548(a)(1), 550, & 551, and Cal. Civ. Code 3439 et seq.]; and (4) Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Constructive Fraudulent Transfers) [11 U.S.C. 544, 550, and 551] (Attachments: #1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Grimshaw, Matthew) - Warning: See docket entry no.: 2 for corrections - Modified on 8/6/2021 (Bolte, Nickie). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kendall Frozen Fruits, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan C. Murphey