This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/05/2021 at 06:30:55 (UTC).

Katerra, Inc. Jointly Administered under 21-31861.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2021 Katerra, Inc Jointly Administered under 21-31861 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-31862

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtors

Katerra, Inc. Jointly Administered under 21-31861.

Katerra, Inc.

9305 East Via De Ventura

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Aveste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Matthew D Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Streetste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Initial Order for Prosecution) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entered in Error Signed on 6/8/2021 (JosephWellsadi) Modified on 6/8/2021 (JosephWells). (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by PRA Receivables Management, LLC (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge David R Jones is added to the case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur is terminated. (aaloadi) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-31861 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 21-31861. Signed on 6/7/2021 (aaloadi) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-31862) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23075410. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Katerra, Inc.. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D Cavenaugh