This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/13/2021 at 16:38:48 (UTC).

Karla Cuellar

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Karla Cuellar was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Kwan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-13675

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Robert N. Kwan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Karla Cuellar

Alhambra, CA 91801

Trustee

Peter J Mastan (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2627

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael H Colmenares

Attorney at Colmenares & Tomilowitz

5800 S Eastern Avenuesuite 220

Commerce, CA 90040

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

#6

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#11 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#12) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Peter J Mastan (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Available, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: Not Available, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Available. Filed by Trustee Peter J Mastan (TR) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/21/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7-13, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 07/20/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 07/20/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case)). (Mastan (TR), Peter) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Karla Cuellar. (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Karla Cuellar (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)). (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Schild, Avi. (Schild, Avi) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 04/18/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-13675) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50982305. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/21/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7-13, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 07/20/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 07/20/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Karla Cuellar. (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Karla Cuellar. (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Karla Cuellar. (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Karla Cuellar (Colmenares, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H Colmenares