This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/30/2022 at 06:30:48 (UTC).

Karen W. Hall and Spuddog Farm Properties LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Karen W Hall and Spuddog Farm Properties LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jason A. Burgess. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-BK-01326

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Jason A. Burgess

 

Party Details

Debtors

Karen W. Hall

Saint Augustine, FL 32086

Spuddog Farm Properties LLC

552 Boxwood Place

Saint Augustine, FL 32086

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - JAX 11

George C Young Federal Building

Trustee

Aaron R. Cohen

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

David S Jennis

Attorney at Jennis Morse Etlinger

606 East Madison Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Daniel E Etlinger

Attorney at Jennis Morse Etlinger

606 East Madison Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Us Trustee Attorney

Scott E Bomkamp

Attorney at United States Trustee

400 W. Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) Objection to Karen W. Hall and Spuddog Farm Properties, LLC Subchapter V Election Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Creditor WBL SPO II, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#68

(#68) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: 1. CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 26 @ 9:30 AOCNFN 2. Continued Preliminary Hearing on Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall Doc 13 AGREED ORDER ETLINGER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#67

(#67) Proof of Service of Order Granting Debtors Motion for Authorization to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall (related document(s)#61). (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

66 #3

List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors

66 #2

List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors

66 #1

Main Document

#65

(#65) Notice of Filing Proposed Final Cash Collateral Budget Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtors Spuddog Farm Properties LLC, Karen W. Hall (related document(s)#62, #50, #13). (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#62

(#62) Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Expedited Motion for Entry of an Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection (related document(s)#13). Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2022 at 09:30 AM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4A, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#61

(#61) Order Granting Motion For Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts (Related Doc #37). Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

6 #3

Declaration

6 #2

Engagement Letter

6 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Composite UCC Financing Statements

5 #1

Main Document

4 #2

2020 U.S. Individual Income Tax Return

4 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules BCD FGHIJ Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by David S Jennis on behalf of Karen W. Hall. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/29/2022. (Jennis, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Objection to Karen W. Hall and Spuddog Farm Properties, LLC Subchapter V Election Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Creditor WBL SPO II, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: 1. CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 26 @ 9:30 AOCNFN 2. Continued Preliminary Hearing on Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall Doc 13 AGREED ORDER ETLINGER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Proof of Service of Order Granting Debtors Motion for Authorization to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall (related document(s)#61). (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Proof of Service of Second Interim Order Granting Debtors Expedited Motion for Entry of Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtors Karen W. Hall, Spuddog Farm Properties LLC (related document(s)#62). (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors #2 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors) (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Notice of Filing Proposed Final Cash Collateral Budget Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtors Spuddog Farm Properties LLC, Karen W. Hall (related document(s)#62, #50, #13). (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 5, 2022 through July 31, 2022 (Re: Spuddog Farm Properties LLC - 3:22-bk-01341) Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Spuddog Farm Properties LLC. (Etlinger, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2022 (Margaret). (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1, 2022 through July 31, 2022 (Re: Karen W. Hall) Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Etlinger, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2022 (Margaret). (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Expedited Motion for Entry of an Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection (related document(s)#13). Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2022 at 09:30 AM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4A, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Order Granting Motion For Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts (Related Doc #37). Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #58)). Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: June 24, 2022. Filed by David S Jennis on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Cathy P.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application to Employ Jennis Morse Etlinger as Attorney Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall (Attachments: #1 Engagement Letter #2 Declaration) (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Composite UCC Financing Statements) (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance With 11 U.S.C. s. 1116(1) Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Attachments: #1 2020 U.S. Individual Income Tax Return) (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Etlinger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 3:22-bk-01326) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A70334728, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by David S Jennis on behalf of Debtor Karen W. Hall. (Jennis, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules BCD FGHIJ Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by David S Jennis on behalf of Karen W. Hall. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/29/2022. (Jennis, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Bomkamp