This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:07:39 (UTC).

Julles Salvatierra Adams

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Julles Salvatierra Adams was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-10079

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Debtor

Julles Salvatierra Adams

Glendale, CA 91201

Trustee

Edward M Wolkowitz (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #6). Signed on 1/6/2020. (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/10/2020 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 04/10/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/10/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Julles Salvatierra Adams (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #6). Signed on 1/6/2020. (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Julles Salvatierra Adams . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/10/2020 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 04/10/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/10/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Julles Salvatierra Adams (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.