This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:01:26 (UTC).

Julie Ann Buhler

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Julie Ann Buhler was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles M Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-BK-01593

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Charles M Walker

 

Party Details

Debtor

Julie Ann Buhler

Nashville, TN 37214

Us Trustee

US TRUSTEE

701 Broadway Ste 318

Nashville, TN 37203-3966

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ

Attorney at LEFKOVITZ AND LEFKOVITZ, PLLC

908 Harpeth Valley Place

Nashville, TN 37221

Us Trustee Attorney

MEGAN REED SELIBER

Attorney at US Trustee's Office

701 Broadway, Suite 318

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Separately and Contemporaneously, an Application to Pay This Filing Fee in Installments or an Application to Waive Filing Fees is being filed. Small Business Plan due by 11/14/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 11/14/2022. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Julie Ann Buhler. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Briefing for Debtor. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Julie Ann Buhler. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments. Filing fee requested to pay in installments is $1738.00. (RE: Ref Doc #3), BY THE COURT: Judge Marian F. Harrison. (slw) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (SELIBER, MEGAN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Interested Party Ellen U. Davis. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Watson Law Group PLLC. (WATSON, GLEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Watson Law Group PLLC. (WATSON, GLEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Interested Party Ellen U. Davis. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/17/2022 at 09:30 AM. Meeting held telephonically. Please call 877-934-2472 and enter code 8613356# to attend. Last day to File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/16/2022. (SELIBER, MEGAN). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) Notice - Debtor(s) Initial Conference will be held on 5/24/22 at 1:30 P.M. (SELIBER, MEGAN). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (SELIBER, MEGAN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketJudge Charles M Walker added to case. Involvement of Judge Marian F Harrison Terminated reassigned to same Judge as related case 3:21-02410. (slw) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments. Filing fee requested to pay in installments is $1738.00. (RE: Ref Doc #3), BY THE COURT: Judge Marian F. Harrison. (slw) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Briefing for Debtor. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Julie Ann Buhler. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Julie Ann Buhler. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Separately and Contemporaneously, an Application to Pay This Filing Fee in Installments or an Application to Waive Filing Fees is being filed. Small Business Plan due by 11/14/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 11/14/2022. (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Reed Seliber