This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:19:50 (UTC).

Judy Yang

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Judy Yang in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-19038

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Scott C Clarkson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Judy Yang

Trustee

Robert Whitmore (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Judy Yang. (Pham, Alexander) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Judy Yang (Pham, Alexander) WARNING: See docket entries #4 and #5 for corrective actions. Case deficient for Dcl Db Emp Income(LBR F1002-1), due 10/29/19. See docket entry #4 for the Case Commencement Deficiency Notice. Case deficient for Modified on 10/15/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Judy Yang) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Pham, Alexander) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Judy Yang) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Judy Yang) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Judy Yang) Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Pham, Alexander) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Judy Yang. (Pham, Alexander) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Judy Yang. (Pham, Alexander) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Judy Yang (Pham, Alexander) WARNING: See docket entries #4 and #5 for corrective actions. Case deficient for Dcl Db Emp Income(LBR F1002-1), due 10/29/19. See docket entry #4 for the Case Commencement Deficiency Notice. Case deficient for Modified on 10/15/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.