This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/04/2020 at 05:08:52 (UTC).

Joshua Joseph You and Hsaio Chuan Chen

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Joshua Joseph You and Hsaio Chuan Chen was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-19942

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtors

Hsaio Chuan Chen

Los Angeles, CA 90032

Joshua Joseph You

Los Angeles, CA 90032

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Timothy Yoo (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jong Y Kim

Attorney at Law Offices of Jong Yun Kim

3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2226

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Joshua Joseph You, Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen) (Tatum, Shafari) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/08/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 02/08/2021. Cert. of Financial Management due by 02/08/2021 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#3

(#3) List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen, Debtor Joshua Joseph You. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Joshua Joseph You, Hsaio Chuan Chen (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Joshua Joseph You, Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen) (Tatum, Shafari) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Joshua Joseph You, Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen) Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 11/17/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/17/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 11/17/2020. (Tatum, Shafari) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/08/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 02/08/2021. Cert. of Financial Management due by 02/08/2021 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen, Debtor Joshua Joseph You. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Hsaio Chuan Chen, Debtor Joshua Joseph You. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-19942) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51994564. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Joshua Joseph You, Hsaio Chuan Chen (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less