This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:21:25 (UTC).

Jose Diaz

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Jose Diaz in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-19053

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Mark D. Houle

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jose Diaz

Trustee

Robert Whitmore (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Jose Diaz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jose Diaz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 14. Receipt Number 60147797. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Jose Diaz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jose Diaz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jose Diaz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jose Diaz Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/14/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less