This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:26:28 (UTC).

Jorge Sanchez and Zoila Quinonez

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Jorge Sanchez and Zoila Quinonez in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-BK-14023

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Erithe A. Smith

 

Party Details

Debtors

Zoila Quinonez

Jorge Sanchez

US Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

Trustee

Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jorge Sanchez, Zoila Quinonez (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/20/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Joint Debtor Zoila Quinonez, Debtor Jorge Sanchez. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jorge Sanchez, Zoila Quinonez (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.