This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/21/2021 at 05:21:06 (UTC).

Jon Scott Edwards and Lynda Kay Parker

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Jon Scott Edwards and Lynda Kay Parker was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-14151

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtors

Jon Scott Edwards

Venice, CA 90291

Lynda Kay Parker

Venice, CA 90291

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kevin T Simon

Attorney at Law Offices of Kevin T. Simon, APC

21241 Ventura Blvd., Suite 253

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/24/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proofs of Claims due by 7/29/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jon Scott Edwards, Joint Debtor Lynda Kay Parker. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Jon Scott Edwards, Joint Debtor Lynda Kay Parker. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/24/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proofs of Claims due by 7/29/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 2:21-bk-14151) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A52955110. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jon Scott Edwards, Joint Debtor Lynda Kay Parker. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jon Scott Edwards, Joint Debtor Lynda Kay Parker. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Jon Scott Edwards, Joint Debtor Lynda Kay Parker. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Jon Scott Edwards, Lynda Kay Parker Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/3/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/3/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/3/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/3/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/3/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/3/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/3/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 06/3/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 06/3/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/3/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/3/2021. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 06/3/2021. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 06/3/2021. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 06/3/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 06/3/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 06/3/2021. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin T Simon