This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:05:52 (UTC).

John Raymond Nardolilli

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 John Raymond Nardolilli was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-BK-11819

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Debtor

John Raymond Nardolilli

Sherman Oaks, CA 91413

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy J Zamora (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/26/2019 at 10:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Objections for Discharge due by 10/25/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/25/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) Statement About Payment of an Eviction Judgement Against You (Official Form 101B) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 03. Receipt Number 10074251. (admin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Payment of an Eviction Judgement Against You (Official Form 101B) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor John Raymond Nardolilli . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/26/2019 at 10:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Objections for Discharge due by 10/25/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/25/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by John Raymond Nardolilli Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 8/2/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 8/2/2019. (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.