This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:10:30 (UTC).

John K Szeto

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by John K Szeto in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-22129

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Debtor

John K Szeto

US Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

Trustee

Carolyn A Dye (TR)

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor John K Szeto . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor John K Szeto . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20237720. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor John K Szeto . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor John K Szeto . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor John K Szeto . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by John K Szeto Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/14/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.