This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/05/2022 at 06:31:16 (UTC).

John C Holton, III

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 John C Holton, III was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacob A. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-BK-01356

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Jacob A. Brown

 

Party Details

Debtor

John C Holton, III

Jacksonville, FL 32226

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - JAX 11

George C Young Federal Building

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Byron Wright, III

Attorney at Bruner Wright PA

2810 Remington Green Circle

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Robert C Bruner

Attorney at Bruner Wright, P.A.

2810 Remington Green Circle

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Us Trustee Attorney

Jill E Kelso

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

400 W. Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Georgia Evans and Professional Management Systems, Inc. as Accountant Effective as of the Petition Date (Related Doc #19). Service Instructions: Byron Wright is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Margaret) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#30

(#30) Order Approving Amended Application to Employ/Retain Byron Wright III, Robert C. Bruner, and Bruner Wright, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Related Doc #27). Service Instructions: Byron Wright is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Margaret) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

29 #2

Exhibit Supporting Documents

29 #1

Main Document

#28

(#28) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (2016 & 2017 Nissan Titans) Filed by Maya Rubinov on behalf of Creditor Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Rubinov, Maya) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#27

(#27) Amended Application to Employ Byron Wright III, Robert C. Bruner, and Bruner Wright, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

21 #2

Tax Record 2020 Tax Return (Redacted)

21 #1

Main Document

#20

No Description Available

19 #2

Affidavit Declaration of Georgia Evans

19 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III (related document(s)#31). (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III (related document(s)#30). (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 8/31/2022. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - JAX 11. (Kelso, Jill) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Georgia Evans and Professional Management Systems, Inc. as Accountant Effective as of the Petition Date (Related Doc #19). Service Instructions: Byron Wright is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Margaret) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Order Approving Amended Application to Employ/Retain Byron Wright III, Robert C. Bruner, and Bruner Wright, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Related Doc #27). Service Instructions: Byron Wright is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Margaret) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 7, 2022 - July 31, 2022 Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting Documents) (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and continued to the following date to allow further examination of the debtor(s) and/or the records of the debtor(s). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - JAX 11. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/31/2022 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (Jax) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-718-3566. Passcode: 2721444#. (Kelso, Jill) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (2016 & 2017 Nissan Titans) Filed by Maya Rubinov on behalf of Creditor Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Rubinov, Maya) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketThe Application to Employ/Retain (Doc #27) appears to be the type of motion or application listed on the Court's Accompanying Orders List posted on the Court's website #(Click here to view). Local Rule 9072-1(b)(1) states that if a motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, counsel may submit a proposed order at the time that the motion or application is filed. Counsel for the moving party is directed to verify that the motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, and if so, to submit a proposed order granting the motion or approving the application. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Amended Application to Employ Byron Wright III, Robert C. Bruner, and Bruner Wright, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/17/2022 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (Jax) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-718-3566. Passcode: 2721444#. Deadline to file a complaint to determine dischargeability is 10/17/2022. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for the hearing on confirmation of plan. Proofs of Claims due by 9/15/2022. (Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 07/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Jacob A. Brown, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Robert C Bruner on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III. (Bruner, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 3:22-bk-01356) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A70370118, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 06/06/2022. Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III. (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of Debtor John C Holton III. (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Byron Wright III on behalf of John C Holton III. Chapter 11 Plan & Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2023. (Wright, Byron) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill E Kelso