This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/10/2020 at 05:11:04 (UTC).

Jingji Lin

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Jingji Lin was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Bluebond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-20072

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jingji Lin

Harbor City, CA 90710

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jong Y Kim

Attorney at Law Offices of Jong Yun Kim

3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2226

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jingji Lin) (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/14/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 02/12/2021. Cert. of Financial Management due by 02/12/2021 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Jingji Lin. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jingji Lin. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jingji Lin (Kim, Jong) WARNING: CASE IS DEFICIENT FOR: Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/23/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 11/23/2020. Modified on 11/9/2020 (Jackson, Wendy Ann). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. CASE IS DEFICIENT FOR: Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/23/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 11/23/2020. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jingji Lin) (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jingji Lin) (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jingji Lin) Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/23/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 11/23/2020. (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/14/2020 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 02/12/2021. Cert. of Financial Management due by 02/12/2021 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Jingji Lin. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jingji Lin. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jingji Lin. (Kim, Jong) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-20072) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52019770. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jingji Lin (Kim, Jong) WARNING: CASE IS DEFICIENT FOR: Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 11/23/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 11/23/2020. Modified on 11/9/2020 (Jackson, Wendy Ann). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less