This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 05:08:21

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Jerome Taylor in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-BK-15763
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Ernest M. Robles
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Us Trustee United States Trustee (LA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Jerome Taylor
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Trustee Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debto...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jerome...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on ...

Fees Apply
1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

Fees Apply
#1

Main Document

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Jerome Taylor (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Jerome Taylor . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jerome Taylor . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jerome Taylor . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 08/16/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 08/16/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jerome Taylor Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 5/31/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 5/31/2019. (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.