This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 05:08:00 (UTC).

Jeffrey Donohue

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Jeffrey Donohue in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-24276

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jeffrey Donohue

Torrance, CA 90505

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

John P Pringle (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

James D. Hornbuckle

Attorney at Cornerstone Law Corporation

11810 Pierce Street, Suite 206

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/06/2020 at 11:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 03/06/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 03/06/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jeffrey Donohue. (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/06/2020 at 11:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 03/06/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 03/06/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jeffrey Donohue. (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jeffrey Donohue. (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jeffrey Donohue Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 01/6/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/20/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/20/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 12/20/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/20/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 12/20/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/20/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/20/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 12/20/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 12/20/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 12/20/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/20/2019. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 12/20/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/20/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 12/20/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 12/20/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/20/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 12/20/2019. (Hornbuckle, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less