This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2021 at 05:09:29 (UTC).

Jason Zimmatore and Jessica A. Sudalnik

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Jason Zimmatore and Jessica A Sudalnik was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-10874

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtors

Jason Zimmatore

Los Angeles, CA 90068

Jessica A. Sudalnik

Los Angeles, CA 90068

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Douglas A. Crowder

Attorney at Crowder Law Center, PC

303 N. Glenoaks Blvd., Suite 200

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/18/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/10/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 04/14/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by Douglas A. Crowder of Crowder Law Center, PC on behalf of Jason Zimmatore, Jessica A. Sudalnik. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Douglas A. Crowder of Crowder Law Center, PC on behalf of Jason Zimmatore, Jessica A. Sudalnik. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/18/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/10/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 04/14/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Jessica A. Sudalnik, Debtor Jason Zimmatore. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by Douglas A. Crowder of Crowder Law Center, PC on behalf of Jason Zimmatore, Jessica A. Sudalnik. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Douglas A. Crowder of Crowder Law Center, PC on behalf of Jason Zimmatore, Jessica A. Sudalnik. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas A Crowder