This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/23/2020 at 06:33:34 (UTC).

Jason International Holdings Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Jason International Holdings Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Drain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-BK-22773

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert D. Drain

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jason International Holdings Inc.

777 Westchester Avenue, Suite 101

White Plains, NY 10604

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor, Www.Epiqglobal.Com

New York, NY 10017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jonathan S. Henes

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4675

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPending Deadlines for Schedules Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Jason International Holdings, Inc. Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason International Holdings Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Jason International Holdings, Inc. Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason International Holdings Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketClaims and Noticing Agent, Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC, added to the case. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order signed on 6/29/2020 (I) Authorizing And Approving the Appointment of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent to the Debtors, Effective as of June 24, 2020, and (II) Granting Related Relief(Related Doc # 5, Motion to Appoint...filed in the Lead Case 20-22766-rdd Jason Industries). (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCASE JOINTLY ADMINISTERED UNDER LEAD CASE 20-22766-rdd Jason Industries, Inc.: 20-22767-rdd Jason Partners Holdings Inc. , 20-22768-rdd Jason Holdings, Inc. I , 20-22769-rdd Jason Incorporated, 20-22770-rdd Milsco, LLC, 20-22771-rdd Osborn, LLC, 20-22772-rdd Schaffner Manufacturing Co., Inc. , . (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order signed on 6/29/2020 Granting Motion (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc #2) . (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketPending Deadlines Terminated. (Walker, Justin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketDeficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 8/10/2020. Schedule A/B due 7/8/2020. Schedule D due 7/8/2020. Schedule E/F due 7/8/2020. Schedule G due 7/8/2020. Schedule H due 7/8/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/8/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/8/2020. List of all creditors due 7/8/2020. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 7/8/2020. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 7/8/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 7/8/2020, (Walker, Justin). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason International Holdings Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-22773) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14087630. Fee amount 1717.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jonathan S. Henes of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Jason International Holdings Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan S. Henes(Designation Retained)