This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/23/2020 at 06:32:40 (UTC).

Jason Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Jason Industries, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Drain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-BK-22766

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert D. Drain

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jason Industries, Inc.

777 Westchester Avenue, Suite 101

White Plains, NY 10604

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor, Www.Epiqglobal.Com

New York, NY 10017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jonathan S. Henes

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4675

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#217) Operating Report /Corporate Monthly Operating Report (July 2020) Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#216) Operating Report /Corporate Monthly Operating Report (June 2020) Filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#215) Affidavit of Service of Greg Winter (related document(s)#212) filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#213) Affidavit of Service of Geoff Zahm (related document(s)#204, #206, #203, #208, #207, #205, #202) filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Telephonic Confirmation Hearing filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) Affidavit of Service of Geoff Zahm (related document(s)#201, #199, #200) filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) Affidavit of Service of Greg Winter (related document(s)#194) filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) Affidavit of Service of Geoff Zahm (related document(s)#196, #197) filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) Chapter 11 Plan / Notice of Immaterial Modifications to Joint Prepackaged Plan of Reorganization of Jason Industries, Inc. and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)#22, #139) filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) Amended Notice of Agenda / Second Amended Agenda for August 17, 2020 Remote Confirmation Hearing (related document(s)#201, #194) filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to File A Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting A Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (II) Authorizing the Debtors To File A Consolidated List of the Debtors' Thirty Largest Unsecured Creditors, (Iii) Authorizing the Debtors to Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information for the Debtors' Employees, (IV) Approving the Form and Manner of Notifying Creditors of Commencement, (V) Waiving Requirements To File Lists of Equity Holders, and (VI) Granting Related Relief filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim And Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Accounts Payable Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to All Undisputed Obligations on Account of Outstanding Orders, and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Appoint Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent / Debtors' Application For Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing And Approving the Appointment of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent, Effective as of June 24, 2020, and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Establishing Certain Notice, Case Management, and Administrative Procedures and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Telephonic Hearing on First Day Motions with hearing to be held on 6/25/2020 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDeficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 8/10/2020. Schedule A/B due 7/8/2020. Schedule D due 7/8/2020. Schedule E/F due 7/8/2020. Schedule G due 7/8/2020. Schedule H due 7/8/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/8/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/8/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 7/8/2020, (Walker, Justin). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-22766) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14087630. Fee amount 1717.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert D. Drain added to the case. (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jonathan S. Henes of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Jason Industries, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan S. Henes(Designation Retained)