This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:08:17 (UTC).

James Smith

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 James Smith was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-10087

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

James Smith

Los Angeles, CA 90003

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Elissa Miller (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor James Smith . (Toliver, Wanda) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020 (Toliver, Wanda). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

4 #2

Main Document

4 #1

Incorrect PDF

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/11/2020 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/13/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Toliver, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor James Smith . (Toliver, Wanda) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020 (Toliver, Wanda). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor James Smith . (Toliver, Wanda) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020 (Toliver, Wanda). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/11/2020 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/13/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Toliver, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by James Smith Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 1/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 1/21/2020. (Toliver, Wanda) Case also deficient for Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Incomplete filing due by 1/21/2020. Modified on 1/6/2020 (Toliver, Wanda). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.