This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/26/2021 at 06:31:27 (UTC).

James E. Carpenter

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 James E Carpenter was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Washington Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick P. Corbit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-00250

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick P. Corbit

 

Party Details

Debtor

James E. Carpenter

Po Box 5188

George, WA 98824

Us Trustee

US Trustee

920 W Riverside Ave, Suite 593

Spokane, WA 99201

Trustee

Virginia A Burdette

Seattle, WA 98116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kevin ORourke

Attorney at Southwell and O'Rourke

421 W Riverside Avenue, Suite 960

Spokane, WA 99201

Us Trustee Attorney

Gary W Dyer

Attorney at U S Trustee's Office

920 W Riverside Ave, Suite 593

Spokane, WA 99201

 

Court Documents

#71

#70

#69

68 #2

MML Revision

68 #1

Main Document

15 #2

Ntc of Status Conference SubV: Notice Recipients

15 #1

Ntc of Status Conference SubV

14 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtg I/J SubCh V: Notice Recipients

14 #1

Notice of Ch11 Mtg I/J SubCh V

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MINUTE Entry.Status Conference. HELD. Debtor intends to prepare and file the plan prior to May 26th and anticipates paying creditors in full. Mr. O'Rourke is working on the insurance issues. Discussion ensued as to the real estate contracts. Appearances: Kevin O'Rourke, attorney for debtor; Virginia Burdette, chapter 11 trustee; Gary Dyer, attorney for the U.S. Trustee; Trevor Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank (related document(s): #15 Notice of Status Conference - Ch 11 Small Business) (JKB) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/20/2021 11:01:59 AM ]. File Size [ 3028 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:37 ]. (JoleneBritton). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Meeting of Creditors Notice (Ch 11)#14). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Amended Schedules#68). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT of Amended Schedules(# 21-00250-FPC11) [misc,amdscht] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7797683. Fee amount 32.00 (RE: Amended Schedules#68). (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) AMENDED SCHEDULES filed: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Declaration, for Individual Fee Amount $32. (RE: CHAPTER 11 Voluntary Petition and Accompanying Documents#1). (Attachments: #1 MML Revision) Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER Granting Application to Approve Employment of Curt Morris, Martin & Morris Real Estate, LLC as Realtor (Re: #47). (TJL) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Statement of Financial Affairs#64). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER Uploaded. Filed by ORourke, Kevin. (RE: #47 ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) AMENDED STATEMENT of Financial Affairs for Individual (RE: CHAPTER 11 Voluntary Petition and Accompanying Documents#1). Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Application to Approve Employment#8, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#9). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Application to Approve Employment#8). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION to Approve Employment of Southwell & O'Rourke, P.S. as Attorneys for Debtor. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter. (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (RE: Notice of Stay#6). (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Stay. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT of Witness to Signing of Document (RE: CHAPTER 11 Voluntary Petition and Accompanying Documents#1, Statement of Social Security Number(s)#3, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors#4). Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FOR Individual Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT of Social Security Number(s). This PDF is restricted due to the Judicial Privacy Policy. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CREDIT Counseling Certificate as to Debtor. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of James E. Carpenter (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VOLUNTARY Petition Under Chapter 11, Subchapter V and Accompanying Documents Individual, Fee Amount $1738. Receipt Number A7771799, Summary of Schedules due 03/11/2021. Schedules A-J due 03/11/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/11/2021. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 03/11/2021. Incomplete Filings due 03/11/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/24/2021. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 05/26/2021. (ORourke, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES CARPENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary W Dyer