This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/03/2022 at 11:14:33 (UTC).

Izard County Medical Center, LLC v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Izard County Medical Center, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-06020

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Izard County Medical Center, LLC

61 Grasse Street

Calico Rock, AR 72519

Defendant

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

1 W. 1St Avenue

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E. Prince

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000, Key Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Izard County Medical Center, LLC, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Dismissal Filed by Izard County Medical Center, LLC. (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAdversary Proceeding 22-6020 Closed. (rah) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Dismissal Filed by Izard County Medical Center, LLC. (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Izard County Medical Center, LLC, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 22-06020-grs) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11073068, amount $ 350.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 22-06020. Complaint, filed by Izard County Medical Center, LLC against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation Fee Amount 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Prince